EP1317624 - HYDRAULIC SYSTEM COMPRISING A MAIN PUMP AND A PRECOMPRESSION PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brueninghaus Hydromatik GmbH Glockeraustrasse 2 89275 Elchingen / DE | [2008/11] |
Former [2003/24] | For all designated states BRUENINGHAUS HYDROMATIK GMBH Glockeraustrasse 2 89275 Elchingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEMMEN, Ralf Dürerstr. 14 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2003/38] |
Former [2003/24] | 01 /
LEMMEN, Ralf Eugenstrasse 25 72072 Tübingen / DE | Representative(s) | Körfer, Thomas Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/24] | Körfer, Thomas, Dipl.-Phys. Mitscherlich & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01956507.6 | 29.06.2001 | [2003/24] | WO2001EP07459 | Priority number, date | DE2000145118 | 13.09.2000 Original published format: DE 10045118 | [2003/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0223041 | Date: | 21.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1317624 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1317624 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F04B23/10, F04B23/04, F04C15/00, F04C11/00 | [2008/01] | CPC: |
F04C14/08 (EP,US);
F04B23/04 (EP,US);
F04B23/106 (EP,US);
F04B49/08 (EP,US);
F04C11/005 (EP,US);
F04B2203/0209 (EP,US);
F04B23/12 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/24] | F04B23/10, F04B23/04, F04C15/04, F04C11/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2004/22] |
Former [2003/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | HYDRAULISCHES SYSTEM MIT EINER HAUPTPUMPE UND EINER VORDRUCKPUMPE | [2003/24] | English: | HYDRAULIC SYSTEM COMPRISING A MAIN PUMP AND A PRECOMPRESSION PUMP | [2003/24] | French: | SYSTEME HYDRAULIQUE COMPORTANT UNE POMPE PRINCIPALE ET UNE POMPE DE PRECOMPRESSION | [2003/24] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/24] | 30.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US3431856 (WHITMORE CHARLES H, et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,9,11 * abstract * * column 1, line 21 - column 3, line 16 * * figure 1 * [A] 3,7,8,10,12,15; | [XA]GB2150981 (VS ENG LTD) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,10,15 * abstract * * page 1, line 55 - line 115 * * figure 1 * [A] 8,9,12; | [XA]DE4403618 (URACA PUMPEN [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,12 * abstract * * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 53 * * figure - *[A] 6,13; | [XA]DE19902292 (MANNESMANN REXROTH AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,12 * abstract * * column 1, line 11 - column 2, line 7 * * figure 1 * [A] 10,13,16,17 |