EP1303730 - EXPANSION DEVICE FOR REFRIGERANT FLUID AND CONDITIONING CIRCUIT COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Manuli Auto France Le Jardin d'Entreprises, 2, avenue Gustave Eiffel 28000 Chartres / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/17] | For all designated states Manuli Auto France Le Jardin des Entreprises, 2, avenue Gustave Eiffel 28000 Chartres / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARON, Daniel 5, rue Saint-Séverin F-28630 Fontenay-sur-Eure / FR | [2003/17] | Representative(s) | Benech, Frédéric Cabinet Benech 15, rue d'Astorg 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/17] | Benech, Frédéric 146-150, Avenue des Champs-Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 01956603.3 | 18.07.2001 | [2003/17] | WO2001FR02338 | Priority number, date | FR20000009554 | 20.07.2000 Original published format: FR 0009554 | [2003/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0208677 | Date: | 31.01.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1303730 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1303730 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F25B41/06, B60H1/00, B60H1/32, F16L33/207 | [2003/17] | CPC: |
F16L33/2076 (EP,US);
B60H1/00571 (EP);
B60H1/3229 (US);
F25B41/37 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2005/14] |
Former [2004/47] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2004/22] | DE, FR, IT | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENTSPANNUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR KÜHLMITTEL UND EINE SOLCHE VORRICHTUNG ENTHALTENDER KÜHLKREISLAUF | [2003/17] | English: | EXPANSION DEVICE FOR REFRIGERANT FLUID AND CONDITIONING CIRCUIT COMPRISING SAME | [2003/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF DETENDEUR POUR FLUIDE FRIGORIGENE ET CIRCUIT DE CONDITIONNEMENT COMPRENANT UN TEL DISPOSITIF | [2003/17] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.02.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/17] | 21.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2007/34] | IT | 18.07.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2764960 (MANULI AUTO FRANCE [FR]) [X] 1,6-12 * the whole document *; | [XY]US5961157 (BARON DANIEL [FR], et al) [X] 1,6-12 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,5; | [Y]EP0943879 (WHIRLPOOL CO [US]) [Y] 2,3 * the whole document *; | [Y]US3642030 (AMICK LARRY D) [Y] 5 * the whole document * * column 2, line 37 - line 52 *; | [A]US5215660 (MOSHER WILLIAM M [US], et al) [A] 4 * the whole document *; | [A]WO8304297 (EB VAERMEINREGLERING HB [SE]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]US4324112 (FUJIWARA KENICHI, et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]US5655387 (MATAMBO THOMPSON J [US], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]US5081847 (ANDERSON JR RUSSELL C [US]) [A] * the whole document * |