EP1309617 - PROCESS FOR THE SELECTION OF HIV-1 SUBTYPE C ISOLATES, SELECTED HIV-1 SUBTYPE ISOLATES, THEIR GENES AND MODIFICATIONS AND DERIVATIVES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2011 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEDICAL RESEARCH COUNCIL Francie Van Zijl Drive, Parow Valley 7500 Cape Town / ZA | For all designated states University of Cape Town Observatory 7500 Cape Town / ZA | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL CB 4100, Bynum Hall Chapel Hill, NC 27599-4100 / US | For all designated states Alphavax, Inc. P.O. Box 110307, 2 Triangle Drive Research Triangle Park, NC 27709-0307 / US | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/32] | For all designated states MEDICAL RESEARCH COUNCIL Francie Van Zijl Drive, Parow Valley 7500 Cape Town / ZA | ||
For all designated states University of Cape Town Observatory 7500 Cape Town / ZA | |||
For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL CB 4100, Bynum Hall Chapel Hill, NC 27599-4100 / US | |||
For all designated states Alphavax, Inc. P.O. Box 110307, 2 Triangle Drive Research Triangle Park, NC 27709-0307 / US | |||
Former [2003/20] | For all designated states MEDICAL RESEARCH COUNCIL Francie Van Zijl Drive, Parow Valley 7500 Cape Town / ZA | ||
For all designated states University of Cape Town Observatory 7500 Cape Town / ZA | |||
For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL Office of Research Services, CB 4100, 300 Bynum Hall Chapel Hill, NC 27599-4100 / US | |||
For all designated states Alphavax, Inc. P.O. Box 110307, 2 Triangle Drive Research Triangle Park, NC 27709-0307 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILLIAMSON, Carolyn University of Cape Town, Observatory 7500 Cape Town / ZA | 02 /
SWANSTROM, Ronald, Ivar University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill CB 4100 Bynum Hall Chapel Hill, NC 27599-4100 / US | 03 /
MORRIS, Lynn Nat. Inst. for Communicable Diseases Private Bag X 4, Modderfontein Road 2131 Sandringham / ZA | 04 /
KARIM, Salim, Abdool, University of Natal Francis Stock Bldg,Room 21 232 King George V Ave. Durban 4001 / ZA | 05 /
JOHNSTON, Robert, Edward University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill CB 4100 Bynum Hall Chapel Hill, NC 27599-410 0 / US | [2010/17] |
Former [2003/50] | 01 /
WILLIAMSON, Carolyn University of Cape Town, Observatory 7500 Cape Town / ZA | ||
02 /
SWANSTROM, Ronald, Ivar North Carolina at Chapel Hill CB 4100 Bynum Hall Chapel Hill, NC 27599-4100 / US | |||
03 /
MORRIS, Lynn Nat. Inst. for Communicable Diseases Private Bag X 4, Modderfontein Road 2131 Sandringham / ZA | |||
04 /
KARIM, Salim, Abdool, University of Natal Francis Stock Bldg,Room 21 232 King George V Ave. Durban 4001 / ZA | |||
05 /
JOHNSTON, Robert, Edward North Carolina at Chapel Hill CB 4100 Bynum Hall Chapel Hill, NC 27599-410 0 / US | |||
Former [2003/44] | 01 /
WILLIAMSON, Carolyn University of Cape Town, Observatory 7500 Cape Town / ZA | ||
02 /
SWANSTROM, Ronald, Ivar North Carolina at Chapel Hill CB 4100 Bynum Hall Chapel Hill, NC 27599-4100 / US | |||
03 /
MORRIS, Lynn Nat. Inst. for Communicable Diseases Private Bag X 4, Modderfontein Road 2131 Sandringham / ZA | |||
04 /
KARIM, Salim, Abdool Francie van Zijl Drive Parow Valley 7500 Cape Town / ZA | |||
05 /
JOHNSTON, Robert, Edward North Carolina at Chapel Hill CB 4100 Bynum Hall Chapel Hill, NC 27599-410 0 / US | |||
Former [2003/20] | 01 /
WILLIAMSON, Carolyn University of Cape Town, Observatory 7500 Cape Town / ZA | ||
02 /
SWANSTROM, Ronald, Ivar North Carolina at Chapel Hill CB 4100 Bynum Hall Chapel Hill, NC 27599-4100 / US | |||
03 /
MORRIS, Lynn National Institute for Virology Modderfontein Road 2131 Sandringham / ZA | |||
04 /
KARIM, Salim, Abdool Francie van Zijl Drive Parow Valley 7500 Cape Town / ZA | |||
05 /
JOHNSTON, Robert, Edward North Carolina at Chapel Hill CB 4100 Bynum Hall Chapel Hill, NC 27599-410 0 / US | Representative(s) | Albutt, Jodie Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/43] | Albutt, Jodie Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2003/20] | Jones, Elizabeth Louise Frank B. Dehn & Co., 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01956723.9 | 09.07.2001 | [2003/20] | WO2001IB01208 | Priority number, date | US20000216995P | 07.07.2000 Original published format: US 216995 P | ZA20000003437 | 10.07.2000 Original published format: ZA 200003437 | ZA20000004924 | 15.09.2000 Original published format: ZA 200004924 | [2003/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0204494 | Date: | 17.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1309617 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1309617 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/16, C12N7/00, C12N7/02 | [2003/20] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP);
A61K39/12 (EP);
A61K39/21 (EP);
C12N7/00 (EP);
A61K39/00 (EP);
C12N2740/16034 (EP);
C12N2740/16051 (EP);
C12N2740/16122 (EP);
C12N2740/16134 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SELEKTION VON HIV-1 SUBTYP C-ISOLATEN, SOLCHE ISOLATEN, SOWIE DEREN GENE, MODIFIKATIONEN UND ABLEITUNGEN | [2003/20] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE SELECTION OF HIV-1 SUBTYPE C ISOLATES, SELECTED HIV-1 SUBTYPE ISOLATES, THEIR GENES AND MODIFICATIONS AND DERIVATIVES THEREOF | [2003/20] | French: | PROCEDE DE SELECTION D'ISOLATS DE SOUS-TYPE C DU VIH-1, ISOLATS DE SOUS-TYPE C DU VIH-1 SELECTIONNES, GENES, MODIFICATIONS ET DERIVES | [2003/20] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.02.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/20] | 03.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 01.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 27.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/34] | Request for further processing for: | 01.06.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 01.06.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.07.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.09.2010 | BE | 15.09.2010 | CY | 15.09.2010 | DK | 15.09.2010 | FI | 15.09.2010 | NL | 15.09.2010 | SE | 15.09.2010 | TR | 15.09.2010 | GR | 16.12.2010 | ES | 26.12.2010 | PT | 17.01.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2012/03] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IT | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IT | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 15.09.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X] - DE BAAR M.P. ET AL., "Subtype-specific sequence variation of the HIV type 1 long terminal repeat and primer-binding site", AIDS RES. AND HUMAN RETROVIR., (20000320), vol. 16, no. 5, XP002221002 [X] 1-4,27 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/088922200309160 | [A] - TSCHERNING C. ET AL., "Differences in chemokine coreceptor usage between genetyc subtypes of HIV-1", VIROLOGY, (1998), vol. 241, pages 181 - 188, XP002221003 [A] 1-7,9,11,13-30 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/viro.1997.8980 | [X] - NOVITSKY VA ET AL, "Molecular cloning and phylogenetic analysis of human immunodeficiency virus type 1 subtype C: a set of 23 full-length clones from Botswana", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, vol. 73, no. 5, ISSN 0022-538X, (199905), Database accession no. Q9WF90, pages 4427 - 4432, URL: EMBL, XP002144689 [X] 14-16 | [ ] - "Gag polyprotein", EMBL PROTEINS, (19991101), Database accession no. Q9WF90, URL: EMBL, XP002221006 [ ] * 95.7% identity with seq. 1 * * 94.5% identity with seq. 5 * * 94.8% identity with seq. 12 * | [ ] - "Gag-pol polyprotein", EMBL PROTEINS, (19991101), Database accession no. Q9WF89, URL: EMBL, XP002221007 [ ] * aa 457-1139: 86.8% identity with seq. 7 (aa 170-850) * | [ ] - "HIV-1 isolate C-96BW04.02", EMBL DNA, (19990311), Database accession no. AF110962, URL: EMBL, XP002221008 [ ] * nt 1582-3703: 72% identity with seq. 6 (nt 449-2571) * | [ ] - "HIV-1 isolate C-96BW11.04 country Botswana", EMBL DNA, (19990311), Database accession no. AF110969, URL: EMBL, XP002221009 [ ] * nt 6152-8143: 89% identity with seq. 10 (nt 591-2579) * | [ ] - "HIV-1 isolate C-96BW15B03 country Botswana", EMBL DNA, Database accession no. AF110973, URL: EMBL, XP002221010 [ ] * nt 280-1760: 75% identity with seq. 4 (nt 91-1571) * | [X] - GAO F ET AL, "Molecular cloning and analysis of functional envelope genes from human immunodeficiency virus type 1 sequence subtypes A through G. The WHO and NIAID networks for HIV isolation and characterization", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (199603), vol. 70, no. 3, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 1651 - 1667, XP002123321 [X] 20 | [ ] - "Envelope glycoprotein", EMBL PROTEINS, (19961101), Database accession no. Q70014, URL: EMBL, XP002221011 [ ] * aa 215-554:85% identity with seq. 3 * * aa 215-348+469-563 about 85% identity with seq. 14 * | [X] - LOLE K S ET AL, "FULL-LENGTH HUMAN IMMUNODEFICIENCY VIRUS TYPE 1 GENOMES FROM SUBTYPE C-INFECTED SEROCONVERTERS IN INDIA, WITH EVIDENCE OF INTERSUBTYPE RECOMBINATION", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (199901), vol. 73, no. 1, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 152 - 160, XP002929279 [X] 22,23 | [ ] - "envelope protein", EMBL PROTEINS, (19981101), Database accession no. O90096, URL: EMBL, XP002221012 [ ] * 83% identity with seq. 9 * * 82% identity with seq. 11 (aa 24-857) * | [PX] - LEIGH BROWN A.J. ET AL., "Reduced susceptibility of human immunodeficiency virus type 1 (HIV-1) from patients with primary HIV infection to nonnucleoside reverse transcriptase inhibitors is associated with variation at novel amino acid sites.", J. VIROL., (200011), vol. 74, no. 22, pages 10269 - 10273, XP002221004 [PX] 18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.74.22.10269-10273.2000 | [ ] - "Reverse transcriptase", EMBL PROTEINS, (20010601), Database accession no. Q99FC3, URL: EMBL, XP002221013 [ ] * aa25-302: 96.7% identity with seq. 2 * * aa 26-302: 97.5% identity with seq.13 * | [A] - "HIV-1 isolate BU/91/07, envelope", EMBL DNA, (19960102), Database accession no. HI1U39249, URL: EMBL, XP002221014 [A] 13 * nt420-2559: 70% identity with seq. 8 (nt 402-2541) * | [A] - VAN HARMELEN J.H. ET AL., "A predominantly HIV Type 1 subtype C-restricted epidemic in South African urban populations", AIDS RES. AND HUMAN RETROVIR., (1999), vol. 15, no. 4, pages 395 - 398, XP002221005 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/088922299311376 |