EP1309620 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR THE DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF DISORDERS INVOLVING ANGIOGENESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/20] | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAKER, Kevin, P. 14006 Indian Run Drive Darnestown, MD 20878 / US | 02 /
FERRARA, Napoleone No 704, 2090 Pacific Avenue San Francisco, CA 94109 / US | 03 /
GERBER, Hanspeter No 5, 1121 Tennessee Street San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | 04 /
GERRITSEN, Mary, E. 541 Parrott Drive San Mateo, CA 94402 / US | 05 /
GODDARD, Audrey 110 Congo Street San Francisco, CA 94131 / US | 06 /
GODOWSKI, Paul, J. 25 Orange Court Hillsborough, CA 94010 / US | 07 /
GURNEY, Austin, L. 1 Debbie Lane Belmont, CA 94002 / US | 08 /
HILLAN, Kenneth, J. 64 Seward Street San Francisco, CA 94114 / US | 09 /
MARSTERS, Scot, A. 990 Cherry Street San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | 10 /
PAN, James 2705 Coronet Boulevard Belmont, CA 94002 / US | 11 /
PAONI, Nicholas, F. 1756 Terrace Drive Belmont, CA 94002 / US | 12 /
STEPHAN, Jean-Philippe, F. 320 C Lansdale Avenue Millbrae, CA 94030 / US | 13 /
WATANABE, Colin, K. 128 Corliss Drive Moraga, CA 94556 / US | 14 /
WILLIAMS, P., Mickey 509 Alto Avenue Half Moon Bay, CA 94019 / US | 15 /
WOOD, William, I. 35 Southdown Court Hillsborough, CA 94010 / US | 16 /
YE, Weilan 119 Barkentine Street Foster City, CA 94404 / US | [2009/50] |
Former [2003/20] | 01 /
BAKER, Kevin, P. 14006 Indian Run Drive Darnestown, MD 20878 / US | ||
02 /
FERRARA, Napoleone No 704, 22090 Pacific Avenue San Francisco, CA 94109 / US | |||
03 /
GERBER, Hanspeter No 5, 1121 Tennessee Street San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | |||
04 /
GERRITSEN, Mary, E. 541 Parrott Drive San Mateo, CA 94402 / US | |||
05 /
GODDARD, Audrey 110 Congo Street San Francisco, CA 94131 / US | |||
06 /
GODOWSKI, Paul, J. 2627 Easton Drive Burlingame, CA 94010 / US | |||
07 /
GURNEY, Austin, L. 1 Debbie Lane Belmont, CA 94002 / US | |||
08 /
HILLAN, Kenneth, J. 64 Seward Street San Francisco, CA 94114 / US | |||
09 /
MARSTERS, Scot, A. 990 Cherry Street San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | |||
10 /
PAN, James 2705 Coronet Boulevard Belmont, CA 94002 / US | |||
11 /
PAONI, Nicholas, F. 1756 Terrace Drive Belmont, CA 94002 / US | |||
12 /
STEPHAN, Jean-Philippe, F. 320 C Lansdale Avenue Millbrae, CA 94030 / US | |||
13 /
WATANABE, Colin, K. 128 Corliss Drive Moraga, CA 94556 / US | |||
14 /
WILLIAMS, P., Mickey 509 Alto Avenue Half Moon Bay, CA 94019 / US | |||
15 /
WOOD, William, I. 35 Southdown Court Hillsborough, CA 94010 / US | |||
16 /
YE, Weilan 119 Barkentine Street Foster City, CA 94404 / US | Representative(s) | Denison, Christopher Marcus Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/20] | Denison, Christopher Marcus Mewburn Ellis York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 01957073.8 | 20.06.2001 | [2003/20] | WO2001US19692 | Priority number, date | US20000213637P | 23.06.2000 Original published format: US 213637 P | US20000219556P | 20.07.2000 Original published format: US 219556 P | US20000220624P | 25.07.2000 Original published format: US 220624 P | US20000220664P | 25.07.2000 Original published format: US 220664 P | WO2000US20710 | 28.07.2000 Original published format: PCT/US00/20710 | US20000222695P | 02.08.2000 Original published format: US 222695 P | US20000643657 | 17.08.2000 Original published format: US 643657 | WO2000US23522 | 23.08.2000 Original published format: PCT/US00/23522 | WO2000US23328 | 24.08.2000 Original published format: PCT/US00/23328 | US20000230978P | 07.09.2000 Original published format: US 230978 P | US20000664610 | 18.09.2000 Original published format: US 664610 | US20000665350 | 18.09.2000 Original published format: US 665350 | US20000242922P | 24.10.2000 Original published format: US 242922 P | US20000709238 | 08.11.2000 Original published format: US 709238 | WO2000US30952 | 08.11.2000 Original published format: PCT/US00/30952 | WO2000US30873 | 10.11.2000 Original published format: PCT/US00/30873 | WO2000US32678 | 01.12.2000 Original published format: PCT/US00/32678 | US20000747259 | 20.12.2000 Original published format: US 747259 | WO2000US34956 | 20.12.2000 Original published format: PCT/US00/34956 | US20010767609 | 22.01.2001 Original published format: US 767609 | US20010796498 | 28.02.2001 Original published format: US 796498 | WO2001US06520 | 28.02.2001 Original published format: PCT/US01/06520 | WO2001US06666 | 01.03.2001 Original published format: PCT/US01/06666 | US20010802706 | 09.03.2001 Original published format: US 802706 | US20010808689 | 14.03.2001 Original published format: US 808689 | US20010816744 | 22.03.2001 Original published format: US 816744 | US20010828366 | 05.04.2001 Original published format: US 828366 | US20010854208 | 10.05.2001 Original published format: US 854208 | US20010854280 | 10.05.2001 Original published format: US 854280 | US20010866028 | 25.05.2001 Original published format: US 866028 | US20010866034 | 25.05.2001 Original published format: US 866034 | WO2001US17092 | 25.05.2001 Original published format: PCT/US01/17092 | US20010870574 | 30.05.2001 Original published format: US 870574 | WO2001US17443 | 30.05.2001 Original published format: PCT/US01/17443 | WO2001US17800 | 01.06.2001 Original published format: PCT/US01/17800 | [2003/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0200690 | Date: | 03.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1309620 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/47, C12N15/12, A61K38/17, C07K16/18 | [2003/20] | CPC: |
C07K14/47 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR DIAGNOSE UND DER BEHANDLUNG VON KRANKHEITEN, BEI DENEN DIE ANGIOGENESE EINE ROLLE SPIELT | [2003/20] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR THE DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF DISORDERS INVOLVING ANGIOGENESIS | [2003/20] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCEDES DE DIAGNOSE ET TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES FAISANT INTERVENIR L'ANGIOGENESE | [2003/20] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/20] | 08.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/39] | 06.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/39] | Divisional application(s) | EP08019420.2 / EP2042597 | EP09004415.7 / EP2168980 | EP09004417.3 / EP2077276 | EP09004418.1 / EP2075253 | EP10182597.4 / EP2275549 | EP14166919.2 / EP2792747 | Request for further processing for: | 24.01.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 24.01.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.02.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0335243 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]WO9529242 (CHILDRENS MEDICAL CENTER [US]) [A] * the whole document *; | [X]WO9910363 (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * see secreted protein 24 *; | [X]WO9933979 (CHIRON CORP [US]) [X] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9943802 (SAGAMI CHEM RES [JP], et al) [X] 1-19 * see clone HP02239. *; | [XL]WO9946281 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [XL] 1-19 * see PRO181 *; | [X]WO9950405 (GENETICS INST [US]) [X] 1-19 * see pk65_4 and seq.ID's 11 and 12 *; | [XL]US5968744 (HILLMAN JENNIFER L [US], et al) [XL] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [PXL]WO0053756 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [PXL] 1-19 * see seq.ID.322; L: priority. *; | [PXL]WO0053751 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [PXL] 1-21,23,27-29,31,32,34,35 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO0100828 (CORIXA CORP [US], et al) [PX] 1-21,23,27-29,31,32,34,35 * see seq.ID.327 *; | [EL]WO0208284 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [EL] 1-35,37,41* See seq.ID's 1 and 120. L: priority. *; | [A] - FOLKMAN J, "CLINICAL APPLICATIONS OF RESEARCH ON ANGIOGENESIS", NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, THE, MASSACHUSETTS MEDICAL SOCIETY, WALTHAM, MA, US, (19951228), vol. 333, no. 26, ISSN 0028-4793, pages 1757 - 1763, XP000654557 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJM199512283332608 | [A] - KLAGSBRUN M, "REGULATORS OF ANGIOGENESIS: STIMULATORS, INHIBITORS, AND EXTRACELLULAR MATRIX", JOURNAL OF CELLULAR BIOCHEMISTRY, LISS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19911101), vol. 47, no. 3, ISSN 0730-2312, pages 199 - 200, XP000616588 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jcb.240470302 |