EP1360077 - COMPOSITIONS FOR CLEANING ORGANIC AND PLASMA ETCHED RESIDUES FOR SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.07.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.08.2010 [2010/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EKC TECHNOLOGY, INC. 2520 Barrington Court Hayward California 94545 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/46] | For all designated states EKC TECHNOLOGY, INC. 2520 Barrington Court Hayward California 94545 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMALL, Robert, J. 11418 Rampart DRive Dublin, CA 94568 / US | 02 /
PATEL, Bakul, P. 2773 Glen Isle Court Pleasanton, CA 84588 / US | 03 /
LEE, Wai Mun 40898 Abuelo Way Freemont, CA 94539 / US | 04 /
HOLMES, Douglas 5 Bonar Crescent Bridge of Weir PA11 3EH / GB | 05 /
DAVIOT, Jerome 3/1 119 Whitehill Street Glasgow G31 2LS / GB | 06 /
REID, Christopher Flat G1F, 2 Caledon Street, Hillhead Glasgow GR90X / GB | [2003/46] | Representative(s) | Setna, Rohan P., et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/46] | Setna, Rohan P., et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 01957117.3 | 10.07.2001 | [2003/46] | WO2001US21713 | Priority number, date | US20000217650P | 10.07.2000 Original published format: US 217650 P | [2003/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0204233 | Date: | 17.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1360077 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.01.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B44C1/22, C09K13/00, H01L21/00 | [2003/46] | CPC: |
G03F7/423 (EP,US);
H01L21/306 (KR);
C09K13/08 (EP,US);
G03F7/425 (EP,US);
G03F7/426 (EP,US);
H01L21/02063 (EP,US);
H01L21/02071 (EP,US);
H01L21/31133 (EP,US);
H01L21/02052 (EP,US);
H01L21/31111 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2004/21] |
Former [2003/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR REINIGUNG VON HALBLEITERN VON ORGANISCHEN UND RESTEN DER PLASMA-ÄTZUNG | [2003/46] | English: | COMPOSITIONS FOR CLEANING ORGANIC AND PLASMA ETCHED RESIDUES FOR SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICES | [2003/46] | French: | COMPOSITIONS POUR ELIMINER DES RESIDUS ORGANIQUES ET DE GRAVURE AU PLASMA POUR DES DISPOSITIFS A SEMI-CONDUCTEURS | [2003/46] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2003 | Search fee paid | 03.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/46] | 22.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/31] | 17.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.10.2003 | 31.07.2009 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5709756 (WARD IRL E [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [X]US5571447 (WARD IRL E [US], et al) [X] 14-22 * the whole document *; | [X]US5698503 (WARD IRL E [US], et al) [X] 14-22 * the whole document *; | [X]US5556833 (HOWE MICHAEL [US]) [X] 23-31 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US5792274 (TANABE MASAHITO [JP], et al); | [A]US5928430 (WARD IRL E [US], et al) |