EP1307733 - CREATININE SENSOR CALIBRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
CH
CY
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/29] | For:AT
BE
CH
CY
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | ||
For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | |||
Former [2005/41] | For:AT
BE
CH
CY
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | ||
For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | |||
Former [2003/19] | For:AT
BE
CH
CY
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG 124 Grenzacherstrasse 4070 Basel / CH | ||
For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHAFFAR, Bernhard Nepomukgasse 27 A-8045 Graz / AT | 02 /
KRONEIS, Herbert Jakob-Gschiel-Gasse 8 A-8052 Graz / AT | 03 /
NOORMOFIDI, Taghi Mantscha 78 A-8054 Graz / AT | 04 /
FLORIAN, Gernot Pistotnikgasse 8 A-8010 Graz / AT | 05 /
STEINBÖCK, Wolf-Dietrich Augasse 24/3 A-8020 Graz / AT | [2003/19] | Representative(s) | Schwarz, Albin, et al Schwarz & Partner Patentanwälte Wipplingerstrasse 30 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Schwarz, Albin, et al Kopecky & schwarz Patentanwälte Wipplingerstrasse 30 1010 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2003/19] | Schwarz, Albin, Dr., et al Patentanwalt Wipplingerstrasse 32/22 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 01957622.2 | 09.08.2001 | [2003/19] | WO2001AT00265 | Priority number, date | AT20000001391 | 11.08.2000 Original published format: AT 13912000 | [2003/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0214533 | Date: | 21.02.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1307733 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1307733 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/327, C12Q1/00 | [2003/19] | CPC: |
G01N33/96 (EP,US);
C12Q1/001 (EP,US);
C12Q1/26 (EP,US);
C12Q1/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/19] | Title | German: | CREATININSENSOR-KALIBRATION | [2003/19] | English: | CREATININE SENSOR CALIBRATION | [2003/19] | French: | ETALONNAGE DE DETECTEUR DE CREATININE | [2003/19] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/19] | 23.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 12.10.2005 | FI | 12.10.2005 | IE | 12.10.2005 | NL | 12.10.2005 | TR | 12.10.2005 | GR | 12.01.2006 | SE | 12.01.2006 | ES | 23.01.2006 | PT | 13.03.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
IE | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
TR | 12.10.2005 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
IE | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
IE | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | NL | 12.10.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS5861459 ; | [A]GB2185318 (GENETICS INT INC) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS60151560 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830630), vol. 007, no. 150, Database accession no. (P - 207), & JP58061459 A 19830412 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO KK) [X] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851221), vol. 009, no. 327, Database accession no. (P - 415), & JP60151560 A 19850809 (FUJI DENKI SOUGOU KENKYUSHO:KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |