EP1337676 - METHOD FOR THE SALT-FREE, NON-OXIDIZING REMELTING OF ALUMINUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.2010 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alumonte Technologiefortschritt in Alumnium GmbH Wiener Strasse 331a 8051 Graz / AT | [2003/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/35] | Representative(s) | Beer, Manfred, et al BEER & PARTNER PATENTANWÄLTE KG Lindengasse 8 1070 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/35] | Beer, Manfred, et al BEER & PARTNER PATENTANWÄLTE KEG Lindengasse 8 A-1070 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 01957623.0 | 20.08.2001 | [2003/35] | WO2001AT00269 | Priority number, date | AT20000001533 | 08.09.2000 Original published format: AT 153300 | [2003/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0220859 | Date: | 14.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1337676 | Date: | 27.08.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C22B21/00, C22B21/06, F27B7/36 | [2003/35] | CPC: |
C22B7/003 (EP,US);
C22B21/0092 (EP,US);
Y02P10/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SALZLOSEN OXIDATIONSFREIEN UMSCHMELZEN VON ALUMINIUM, DESSEN LEGIERUNGEN SOWIE VON ALUMINIUMSCHROTTEN | [2003/35] | English: | METHOD FOR THE SALT-FREE, NON-OXIDIZING REMELTING OF ALUMINUM | [2003/35] | French: | PROCEDE POUR FAIRE FONDRE DE L'ALUMINIUM SANS UTILISER DE SEL ET SANS APPARITION D'UNE OXYDATION | [2003/35] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/35] | 13.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/37] | 13.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH1019470 ; | [XA]US4548651 (RAMSEY EVERETT M [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 9 - line 12 * * column 2, line 44 - line 59 * * column 3, line 25 - line 30 * * column 4, line 4 - line 24 * * column 4, line 51 - column 5, line 16 * * claims 1-5 * [A] 2,3; | [PX]US6247416 (BEAUDOIN PHILIPPE [DE], et al) [PX] 1,2 * abstract * * column 1, line 10 - line 16 * * column 1, line 43 - column 2, line 23 * * column 2, line 48 - line 53 * * claims 1,2,6,7 *; | [XY]EP0962540 (LINDE AG [DE]) [X] 4 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0024] * * figure . * [Y] 7-12; | [Y]US5688470 (SPOEL HAN [CA]) [Y] 7-12 * abstract * * column 1, line 12 - line 14 * * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 12 * * column 4, line 42 - line 46 * * column 5, line 18 - column 8, line 8 * * figure -; claims 1-8,14 *; | [A]US3566091 (BAY THEODOSIOS, et al) [A] 6,7,11 * figures 1A,2 *; | [A]EP0382378 (COPERMILL LTD [GB]) [A] 10,13 * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 4 *; | [E]EP1150085 (SUG SCHMELZ UND GIESSANLAGEN G [DE]) [E] 14 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0027] * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 05, & JP10019470 A 19980123 (HITACHI METALS LTD) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - "NEW TECHNOLOGIES FOR SALT FREE RECOVERY, MELTING AND RECYLING OF ALUMINIUM AND DROSS", FOUNDRY TRADE JOURNAL, FMJ INTERNATIONAL PUBLICATIONS LTD., REDHILL, GB, (19961001), vol. 170, no. 3523, ISSN 0015-9042, pages 491 - 492,494, XP000680794 [A] 1,4 * the whole document * | by applicant | JPH1019470 | US4548651 | EP0962540 | US5688470 | EP0949477 |