EP1320793 - SPREAD SPECTRUM METER READING SYSTEM UTILIZING LOW-SPEED/HIGH-POWER FREQUENCY HOPPING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Itron Inc. 2818 North Sullivan Road Spokane, WA 99215 / US | [2003/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CUMERALTO, Scott, c/o Itron, Inc. 2818 North Sullivan Road Spokane, WA 99215 / US | 02 /
MACCONNELL, John P.O. Box 278 La Canada, California 91012 / US | [2003/28] |
Former [2003/26] | 01 /
CUMERALTO, Scott, c/o Itron, Inc. 2818 North Sullivan Road Spokane, WA 99215 / US | ||
02 /
MACCONNELL, John, c/o Itron, Inc. 2818 North Sullivan Road Spokane, WA 99215 / US | Representative(s) | Hibbert, Juliet Jane Grace, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/26] | Hibbert, Juliet Jane Grace, et al Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01959155.1 | 23.07.2001 | [2003/26] | WO2001US23303 | Priority number, date | US20000220015P | 21.07.2000 Original published format: US 220015 P | [2003/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0208866 | Date: | 31.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1320793 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00 | [2003/26] | CPC: |
H04B3/546 (EP,US);
G08C19/14 (KR);
H04B1/713 (EP,US);
H04B3/36 (EP,US);
H04Q9/00 (EP,US);
H04B2203/5408 (EP,US);
H04B2203/5425 (EP,US);
H04B2203/5433 (EP,US);
H04B2203/5441 (EP,US);
H04B2203/547 (EP,US);
H04B2203/5479 (EP,US);
H04B2203/5491 (EP,US);
H04Q2209/40 (EP,US);
H04Q2209/50 (EP,US);
H04Q2209/60 (EP,US);
H04Q2209/826 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPREIZSPEKTRUM-FEHLERLESESYSTEM MIT FREQUENZSPRUNGVERFAHREN MIT NIEDRIGER GESCHWINDIGKEIT/HOHER LEISTUNG | [2003/26] | English: | SPREAD SPECTRUM METER READING SYSTEM UTILIZING LOW-SPEED/HIGH-POWER FREQUENCY HOPPING | [2003/26] | French: | SYSTEME DE LECTURE DE COMPTEUR A SPECTRE ETALE A SAUTS DE FREQUENCE A VITESSE REDUITE/HAUTE PUISSANCE | [2003/26] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2003 | Search fee paid | 20.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/26] | 06.12.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/03] | Divisional application(s) | EP06076760.5 / EP1750377 | EP10184280.5 / EP2381586 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0178804 (STANDARD TELEPHONES CABLES LTD [GB]); | [Y]US5528621 (HEIMAN FREDRIC [US], et al); | [AP]US6300881 (YEE DAVID MOON [US], et al); | [AP]US6137423 (GLORIOSO CHARLES A [US], et al) |