EP1368203 - STORAGE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2006 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Univenture, Inc. 4707 Roberts Road Columbus, OH 43228-0398 / US | [2003/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOUNGS, Ross, O. 7048 Willow Run Drive Dublin, OH 43017 / US | 02 /
MANZKE, George, W. 8611 Roscoe Place Dublin, OH 43016 / US | 03 /
GERDEMAN, Roger, J. 6694 Lisa Marie Road Columbus, OH 43229 / US | 04 /
WEATHERFORD, James, L. 5945 Groff Court Hilliard, OH 43206 / US | [2003/50] | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/50] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 01959336.7 | 31.07.2001 | [2003/50] | WO2001US23919 | Priority number, date | US20010804820 | 13.03.2001 Original published format: US 804820 | [2003/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02072366 | Date: | 19.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1368203 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1368203 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B42F7/14, B42F13/12 | [2005/20] | CPC: |
B42F13/12 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/50] | B42F7/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPEICHERVORRICHTUNG | [2003/50] | English: | STORAGE DEVICE | [2003/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE | [2003/50] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/50] | 05.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 16.11.2005 | CH | 16.11.2005 | CY | 16.11.2005 | FI | 16.11.2005 | LI | 16.11.2005 | TR | 16.11.2005 | DK | 16.02.2006 | GR | 16.02.2006 | SE | 16.02.2006 | PT | 17.04.2006 | LU | 31.07.2006 | MC | 31.07.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | BE | 16.11.2005 | |
CH | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
LI | 16.11.2005 | ||
TR | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
LU | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | BE | 16.11.2005 | |
CH | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
LI | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | BE | 16.11.2005 | |
CH | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
IT | 16.11.2005 | ||
LI | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | BE | 16.11.2005 | |
CH | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
LI | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | BE | 16.11.2005 | |
CH | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
LI | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | BE | 16.11.2005 | |
CH | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
LI | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | BE | 16.11.2005 | |
CH | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
LI | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | CH | 16.11.2005 | |
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
LI | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | CH | 16.11.2005 | |
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
LI | 16.11.2005 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 16.11.2005 | |
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 16.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2232639 (STERLING MARKING PROD [CA]) [A] 1,21 * page 5, line 6 - page 15, line 9; figures 1-6 *; | [A]EP0559444 (FERGUSON SCOT LIMITED [GB]) [A] 1,21* column 2, line 30 - column 4, line 8; figures 1-10 * |