EP1328713 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRE-PILOT FUEL INJECTION IN DIESEL INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.07.2004 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Engine Intellectual Property Company, LLC. 4201 Winfield Road, P.O. Box 1488 Warrenville, IL 60555 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/30] | For all designated states International Engine Intellectual Property Company, LLC. 4201 Winfield Road, P.O. Box 1488 Warrenville, IL 60555 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZUKOUSKI, Russell, P. 313 Drake Drive Bolingbrook, IL 60490 / US | 02 /
GUI, Xinqun 901 Watercress Drive Naperville, IL 60540 / US | [2003/30] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2003/30] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro, Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 01959343.3 | 30.07.2001 | [2003/30] | WO2001US23936 | Priority number, date | US20000653469 | 01.09.2000 Original published format: US 653469 | [2003/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0220956 | Date: | 14.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1328713 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F02B3/00, F02M37/04 | [2003/30] | CPC: |
F02B3/10 (EP,US);
F02D41/38 (KR);
F02D41/403 (EP,US);
F02B3/06 (EP,US);
F02D41/402 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2004/21] |
Former [2003/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR PREPILOTEINSPRITZUNG IN EINER DIESELKRAFTMASCHINE | [2003/30] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRE-PILOT FUEL INJECTION IN DIESEL INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES | [2003/30] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR INJECTION DE CARBURANT PRE-PILOTE DANS UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE DE TYPE DIESEL | [2003/30] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2003 | Search fee paid | 27.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/30] | 03.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/34] | 19.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/34] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5697342 (ANDERSON MICHAEL D [US], et al); | [A]US5771865 (ISHIDA AKIO [JP]); | [A]US5924403 (THOMAS ERIC D [US]); | [AP]US6164264 (THOMAS ERIC D [US]) |