EP1325527 - AIR FEED TUBE SUPPORT SYSTEM FOR A SOLID OXIDE FUEL CELL GENERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.12.2011 [2011/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Energy, Inc. 4400 Alafaya Trail Orlando, FL 32826-2399 / US | [2010/50] |
Former [2009/46] | For all designated states Siemens Power Generation, Inc. 4400 Alafaya Trail Orlando FL 32826-2399 / US | ||
Former [2003/28] | For all designated states Siemens Westinghouse Power Corporation 4400 Alafaya Trail Orlando, FL 32828-2399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOSHI, Vinod, B. 140 Penn Lear Drive Monroeville, PA 15146 / US | 02 /
RUKA, Roswell, J. 51 Churchill Road Pittsburgh, PA 15235 / US | 03 /
HAGER, Charles, A. 312 Ridge Road Zelienople, PA 16063 / US | [2003/28] | Representative(s) | Morgan, Marc, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Morgan, Marc, et al Siemens Shared Services Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/03] | Morgan, Marc, et al Siemens Corporate Shared Services Siemens AG P.O. Box 22 16 34 80506 Munich / DE | ||
Former [2003/28] | Neill, Andrew Peter Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01959405.0 | 02.08.2001 | [2003/28] | WO2001US24155 | Priority number, date | US20000642463 | 18.08.2000 Original published format: US 642463 | [2003/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0217418 | Date: | 28.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1325527 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1325527 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/02, H01M8/24 | [2010/30] | CPC: |
H01M8/243 (EP,US);
H01M8/02 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0074 (EP,US);
H01M8/0271 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/28] | H01M8/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2003/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | LUFTZUFUHRROHR-TRÄGERANORDNUNG FÜR EINEN FESTOXIDBRENNSTOFFZELLENGENERATOR | [2003/28] | English: | AIR FEED TUBE SUPPORT SYSTEM FOR A SOLID OXIDE FUEL CELL GENERATOR | [2003/28] | French: | SYSTEME DE SUPPORT DE TUBES D'ALIMENTATION EN AIR POUR GENERATEUR A PILES A COMBUSTIBLE OXYDE SOLIDE | [2003/28] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/28] | 01.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH0414766 ; | [A]EP0376579 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12 * figures 3C,4 * * page 5, line 57 - page 6, line 18 *; | [A]EP0469831 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 7, line 35 *; | [A]EP0264688 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]) [A] 1-12 * column 15, lines 56,57; figure 2 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920422), vol. 016, no. 166, Database accession no. (E - 1193), & JP04014766 A 19920120 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1,4 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH0414766 |