EP1423693 - ERYTHROPOIETIN AND ANTI-TUMOR NECROSIS FACTOR ALPHA COMBINATION THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc. U.S. Route 202 Raritan, NJ 08869 / US | [2004/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITRI, Loretta 6 Kimball Circle Westfield, NJ 07090 / US | [2004/23] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2004/23] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01959479.5 | 02.08.2001 | [2004/23] | WO2001US24384 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03012432 | Date: | 13.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1423693 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.02.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/18, A61K38/17, A61K39/395, G01N33/00, A01K67/00, A01K67/033, A01K67/027, A01N43/04, A61K31/70, A61K31/52, A61K31/454, A61P35/00 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61K31/454 (EP);
A61K31/52 (EP);
A61K31/70 (EP);
A61K38/1793 (EP);
A61K38/1816 (EP);
A61K39/395 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
C07K2319/30 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/454, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/52, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/70, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/1793, A61K2300/00 (EP); |
Former IPC [2004/23] | G01N33/00, A01K67/00, A01K67/033, A01K67/027, A01N43/04, A61K31/70 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMBINATIONSTHERAPIE MIT ERYTHROPOETIN UND ANTI-TUMORNEKROSE-FAKTOR-ALPHA | [2004/23] | English: | ERYTHROPOIETIN AND ANTI-TUMOR NECROSIS FACTOR ALPHA COMBINATION THERAPY | [2004/23] | French: | ERYTHROPOIETINE ET TRAITEMENT DE COMBINAISON ALPHA ANTI-FACTEUR DE NECROSE DES TUMEURS | [2004/23] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2004 | Search fee paid | 01.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.03.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/23] | 02.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/51] | 21.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO0210743 (ORTHO MCNEIL PHARM INC [US]) [E] 1-7 * page 4, line 15 - page 7 * * page 10, line 17 - page 13, line 2; claims 23-28 *; | [E]WO0236152 (AMGEN INC [US]) [E] 1-7 * page 10, paragraph 5 - page 11, paragraph 4; claims 47-75 * * page 14, paragraph 2 * * page 17, paragraph 2 - page 20 *; | [Y] - DEMETRI G D ET AL, "QUALITY-OF-LIFE BENEFIT IN CHEMOTHERAPY PATIENTS TREATED WITH EPOETIN ALFA IS INDEPENDENT OF DISEASE RESPONSE OR TUMOR TYPE: RESULTS FROM A PROSPECTIVE COMMUNITY ONCOLOGY STUDY", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, GRUNE AND STRATTON, NEW YORK, NY, US, (199810), vol. 16, no. 10, ISSN 0732-183X, pages 3412 - 3425, XP009031711 [Y] 1-7 * page 3421 - page 3423 * | [Y] - WOLCHOK J D ET AL, "PROPHYLACTIC RECOMBINANT EPOETIN ALFA MARKEDLY REDUCES THE NEED FOR BLOOD TRANSFUSION IN PATIENTS WITH METASTATIC MELANOMA TREATED WITH BIOCHEMOTHERAPY", CYTOKINES, CELLULAR AND MOLECULAR THERAPY, MARTIN DUNITZ PUBLISHERS, LONDON, GB, (199912), vol. 5, no. 4, ISSN 1368-4736, pages 205 - 206, XP009031732 [Y] 1-7 * the whole document * | International search | [A] - PEUCKMANN V. ET AL., "Potential novel uses of thalidomide focus on palliative care", DRUGS, (200008), vol. 60, no. 2, pages 273 - 292, XP002906602 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2165/00003495-200060020-00003 | [Y] - MAKONKAWKEYOON S. ET AL., "Thalidomide inhibits the replication of human immunodeficiency virus type 1", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (199307), vol. 90, pages 5974 - 5978, XP000938703 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.90.13.5974 | [Y] - MARROTT J.B. ET AL., "A double-blind placebo-controlled phase II trial of thalidomide in asymptomatic HIV-positive patients: Clinical tolerance and effect on activation markers and cytokines", AIDS RES. HUM. RETROVIRUSES, (1997), vol. 13, no. 18, pages 1625 - 1631, XP002906601 | [Y] - REGULIER E. ET AL., "Continuous delivery of human and mouse erythropoietin in mice by genetically engineered polymer encapsulated myoblasts", GENE THERAPY, (199808), vol. 5, no. 8, pages 1014 - 1022, XP001013508 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.gt.3300687 | [Y] - ARRIETA O. ET AL., "Protective effect of pentoxifylline plus thalidomide against septic shock in mice", INT. J. EXP. PATH., (199902), vol. 80, no. 1, pages 11 - 16, XP002906600 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2613.1999.00085.x | [Y] - BLADE J. ET AL., "Treatment approaches for relapsing and refractory multiple myeloma", ACTA ONCOL., (2000), vol. 39, no. 7, pages 843 - 847, XP002906599 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/028418600750063604 |