EP1309286 - GYNECOLOGICAL ABLATION SYSTEM USING AN ABLATION NEEDLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/20] | GYNECOLOGICAL ABLATION PROCEDURE AND SYSTEM USING AN ABLATION NEEDLE | ||
[2010/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 05.10.2011 [2011/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lee, Bruce, B. 966 Cass Street, Suite 200 Monterey, CA 93940-4522 / US | [2010/37] |
Former [2003/20] | For all designated states Lee, Bruce, B. 966 Cass Street, Suite 200 Monterey, CA 93940-4522 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/20] | Representative(s) | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol W.P.Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | ||
Former [2003/20] | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol W.P. Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01959672.5 | 07.08.2001 | [2003/20] | WO2001US24916 | Priority number, date | US20000224191P | 09.08.2000 Original published format: US 224191 P | US20010920425 | 31.07.2001 Original published format: US 920425 | [2003/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0211639 | Date: | 14.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1309286 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1309286 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61B19/00 | [2003/20] | CPC: |
A61B18/1487 (EP,US);
A61B17/00 (KR);
A61B17/42 (EP,US);
A61B90/36 (EP,US);
A61B18/00 (EP,US);
A61B18/1477 (EP,US);
A61B18/148 (EP,US);
A61B18/18 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00702 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00791 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00797 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00821 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GYNÄKOLOGISCHE ABLATIONSSYSTEM UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER ABLATIONSNADEL | [2010/14] | English: | GYNECOLOGICAL ABLATION SYSTEM USING AN ABLATION NEEDLE | [2010/14] | French: | SYSTEME D'ABLATION GYNECOLOGIQUE FAISANT APPEL A UNE AIGUILLE D'ABLATION | [2010/14] |
Former [2003/20] | GYNÄKOLOGISCHE ABLATIONSMETHODE UND -SYSTEM UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER ABLATIONSNADEL | ||
Former [2003/20] | GYNECOLOGICAL ABLATION PROCEDURE AND SYSTEM USING AN ABLATION NEEDLE | ||
Former [2003/20] | PROCEDURE D'ABLATION GYNECOLOGIQUE ET SYSTEME FAISANT APPEL A UNE AIGUILLE D'ABLATION | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.03.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/20] | 03.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.03.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/34] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 09.09.2008 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2008 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   14.10.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.09.2010 | CY | 15.09.2010 | DK | 15.09.2010 | FI | 15.09.2010 | GR | 16.12.2010 | PT | 17.01.2011 | [2011/40] |
Former [2011/24] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 15.09.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5293863 (ZHU YONG H [US], et al) [X] 27-29* the whole document *; | [X]US5911036 (WRIGHT JAMES [US], et al) [X] 27-29 * the whole document * | Examination | US5672174 | US5685839 | US6280441 |