EP1410180 - COMPUTER PROCESSING AND PROGRAMMING METHOD USING AUTONOMOUS DATA HANDLERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.04.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 11.05.2011 [2011/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SeaSeer Research and Development LLC 214 Kawehi Place Kula/Maui, HI 96790 / US | [2009/42] |
Former [2004/17] | For all designated states Fables, Wylci 214 Kawehi Place Kula, Maui, HI 96790 / US | ||
For all designated states Park, Jore 214 Kawehi Place Kula, Maui, HI 96790 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fables, Wylci P.O. Box 540 Kula, HI 96790 / US | 02 /
Park, Jore P.O. Box 540 Kula, HI 96790 / US | [2009/42] |
Former [2004/17] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/17] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01959811.9 | 23.07.2001 | [2004/17] | WO2001US41389 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03010659 | Date: | 06.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1410180 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.02.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44, G06F9/46 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
G06F9/544 (EP,US);
G06F8/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/17] | G06F9/44 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR COMPUTERVERARBEITUNG UND -PROGRAMMIERUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG AUTONOMER DATEN-HANDLER | [2004/17] | English: | COMPUTER PROCESSING AND PROGRAMMING METHOD USING AUTONOMOUS DATA HANDLERS | [2004/17] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT ET DE PROGRAMMATION INFORMATIQUES A PILOTES DE DONNEES AUTONOMES | [2004/17] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2004 | Search fee paid | 20.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/17] | 02.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/19] | 17.11.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/19] | 23.12.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   27.01.2010 | 31.07.2010 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9502217 (PARK CITY GROUP INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * abstract *; | [X]GB2332288 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [X] 1-20 * figure 1 * * figure 2 * * figure 7 * * figure 8 * * figure 9 * * page 5 - page 12 * * page 15 - page 31 * * page 36 *; | [A] - YANG Z ET AL, "CORBA: A PLATFORM FOR DISTRIBUTED OBJECT COMPUTING", OPERATING SYSTEMS REVIEW, ACM, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19960401), vol. 30, no. 2, ISSN 0163-5980, pages 4 - 31, XP000585086 [A] 1-20 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/232302.232303 | International search | [Y]US5701439 (JAMES DAVID C [US], et al); | [Y]US5937189 (BRANSON MICHAEL JOHN [US], et al) |