EP1309275 - MUSCLE FATIGUE METER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2007 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.10.2007 [2007/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neopraxis Pty Ltd 14 Mars Road Lane Cove, NSW 2066 / AU | [2003/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUNCAN, Michael, Robert 19/302 Burns Bay Road Lane Cove, NSW 2066 / AU | 02 /
PARKER, Simon, Geoffrey 8/98 Alison Road Randwick, New South Wales 2031 / AU | [2003/32] |
Former [2003/20] | 01 /
DUNCAN, Michael, Robert 19/302 Burns Bay Road Lane Cove, NSW 2066 / AU | ||
02 /
PARKER, Simon, Geoffrey Unit 8 Devlin Street Ryde, NSW 2112 / AU | Representative(s) | Pawlyn, Anthony Neil, et al Murgitroyd & Company Cardiff Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/20] | Pawlyn, Anthony Neil, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2004/29] | Browne, Robin Forsythe, Dr. Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2003/20] | Orr, William McLean Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, Tower House, Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01959960.4 | 14.08.2001 | [2003/20] | WO2001AU00995 | Priority number, date | AU2000PQ09413 | 14.08.2000 Original published format: AU PQ941300 | AU2000PQ09441 | 15.08.2000 Original published format: AU PQ944100 | [2003/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0213696 | Date: | 21.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1309275 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 21.02.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/36 | [2003/30] | CPC: |
A61N1/36003 (EP,US);
A61B5/11 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/20] | A61B5/103, A61B5/0488, A61N1/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MUSKELERMÜDUNGSMESSGERÄT | [2003/20] | English: | MUSCLE FATIGUE METER | [2003/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DE LA FATIGUE MUSCULAIRE | [2003/20] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2003 | Search fee paid | 05.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 11.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/20] | 14.09.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   16.02.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4480830 (PETROFSKY JERROLD S [US], et al) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [A]US4817628 (ZEALEAR DAVID L [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [XY]US5070873 (GRAUPE DANIEL [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9,13-15 * column 2, lines 1-53; figure 1 * * column 4, lines 9-38 * * column 5, lines 35-64 * [Y] 5,10-12; | [Y]US5092329 (GRAUPE DANIEL [US], et al) [Y] 10-12 * column 1, line 65 - column 3, line 35; figure 1 *; | [Y] - EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSIOLOGY AND OCCUPATIONAL PHYSIOLOGY, (199909), vol. 80, no. 4, pages 276 - 284, XP008040126 [Y] 5 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s004210050593 | [A] - ACTA OTO-LARYNGOLOGICA, (199009), vol. 110, no. 3-4, pages 168 - 174, XP008039974 [A] 1,2 * abstract * | International search | [A]US4724842 (CHARTERS THOMAS H [US]); | [A]US5116296 (WATKINS K RICHARD [US], et al); | [A]WO9710874 (NEUROMOTION INC [CA]) |