EP1307690 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE GENERATION OF STEAM, IN PARTICULAR FOR A COOKING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2007 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rational AG Iglinger Strasse 62 86899 Landsberg a. Lech / DE | [2003/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHREINER, Thomas Iglinger Str. 5A 86857 Hurlach / DE | 02 /
KOHLSTRUNG, Peter Thomas-Morus-Strasse 8 86830 Kaufering / DE | 03 /
MAAS, Bruno Hauswiesenstr 1 b 86916 Kaufering / DE | 04 /
WIEDEMANN, Peter Südstrasse 8 86836 Klosterlechfeld / DE | 05 /
JUNKER, Elmar Efeustrasse 4 82110 Gemering / DE | [2003/26] |
Former [2003/19] | 01 /
SCHREINER, Thomas Merkelweg 5 86420 Diedorf / DE | ||
02 /
KOHLSTRUNG, Peter Thomas-Morus-Strasse 8 86830 Kaufering / DE | |||
03 /
MAAS, Bruno Johann-Wechsler-Strasse 10 86899 Landsberg am Lech / DE | |||
04 /
WIEDEMANN, Peter Südstrasse 8 86836 Klosterlechfeld / DE | |||
05 /
JUNKER, Elmar Efeustrasse 4 82110 Gemering / DE | Representative(s) | Weber-Bruls, Dorothée, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/19] | Weber-Bruls, Dorothée, Dr., et al Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01960158.2 | 08.08.2001 | [2003/19] | WO2001DE03034 | Priority number, date | DE2000138957 | 09.08.2000 Original published format: DE 10038957 | [2003/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0212790 | Date: | 14.02.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1307690 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1307690 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F22B5/00, A47J27/04, F22B27/12 | [2003/19] | CPC: |
A47J36/00 (EP,US);
F22B27/12 (EP,US);
F22B5/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2003/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERZEUGEN VON DAMPF, INSBESONDERE FÜR EIN GARGERÄT | [2003/19] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE GENERATION OF STEAM, IN PARTICULAR FOR A COOKING DEVICE | [2003/19] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION DE VAPEUR, EN PARTICULIER POUR UN APPAREIL DE CUISSON | [2003/19] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/19] | 04.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/36] | IT | 04.10.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR880494 (BUCHHOLZER THEODORE;VROLIX ALBERT-SYLVAIN-TOUSS) [X] 1,2,17-21 * page 2, line 55 - page 3, line 24; figure - *; | [A]CH687040 (ZSOLT REVESZ [CH]); | [A]DE698319 (HERPEN CO KG LA MONT KESSEL) | by applicant | US4972804 | DE69013906T | DE2214566 | DE904653 | DE2757913 | DE3783361T | DE69207830T |