EP1307519 - ELECTRO IMMERSION LACQUER PRODUCED BY MELT EMULSIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2016 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Coatings GmbH Glasuritstrasse 1 48165 Münster / DE | [2010/16] |
Former [2003/19] | For all designated states BASF Coatings AG Glasuritstrasse 1 48165 Münster / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARTUNG, Michael Zu den drei Linden 1 A 59590 Geseke / DE | 02 /
GROSSE-BRINKHAUS, Karl-Heinz Hagenstr. 90 48301 Nottuln / DE | 03 /
POLKE, Reinhard Alemannenstr. 9 67112 Mutterstadt / DE | 04 /
WOLF, Heiko Europaring 33 67227 Frankenthal / DE | 05 /
STANG, Michael Mühlaustr. 4 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2003/19] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2006/33] |
Former [2003/19] | Fitzner, Uwe, Dr., et al Lintorfer Strasse 10 40878 Ratingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01960505.4 | 17.07.2001 | [2003/19] | WO2001EP08231 | Priority number, date | DE2000136560 | 27.07.2000 Original published format: DE 10036560 | [2003/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0210294 | Date: | 07.02.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1307519 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1307519 | Date: | 09.09.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/44, C08J3/03 | [2003/19] | CPC: |
C09D5/44 (EP,US);
C08J3/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2015/37] |
Former [2003/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | ELEKTROTAUCHLACKE, HERSTELLBAR DURCH SCHMELZEEMULGIERUNG | [2003/19] | English: | ELECTRO IMMERSION LACQUER PRODUCED BY MELT EMULSIFICATION | [2003/19] | French: | PEINTURES ELECTROPHORETIQUES PRODUITES PAR EMULSIFICATION D'UN PRODUIT EN FUSION | [2003/19] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/19] | 11.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.11.2003 | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 09.09.2015 | DK | 09.09.2015 | ES | 09.09.2015 | FI | 09.09.2015 | IT | 09.09.2015 | MC | 09.09.2015 | NL | 09.09.2015 | SE | 09.09.2015 | TR | 09.09.2015 | GR | 10.12.2015 | PT | 11.01.2016 | [2018/29] |
Former [2017/22] | DK | 09.09.2015 | |
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | DK | 09.09.2015 | |
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | ES | 09.09.2015 | |
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 09.09.2015 | |
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | ES | 09.09.2015 | |
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 09.09.2015 | |
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 09.09.2015 | |
GR | 10.12.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0897408 (BASF COATINGS AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,9,10 * page 3, lines 24-52 * * page 7, lines 41-50 *; | [PX]WO0071608 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [PX] 1-3,9,10 * page 3, lines 11-23 * * page 4, lines 11-14; claims 1-3 *; | [A]US4268368 (AVIRAM ARI, et al) [A] 1 * abstract * |