EP1313394 - TOILET SEAT FOR CHILDREN'S USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.2010 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.10.2010 [2010/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Courtney, Anthony Michael 10 Acacia Grove St Neots Huntingdonshire PE19 1HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/22] | For all designated states Courtney, Anthony Michael 10 Acacia Grove St Neots, Huntingdonshire PE19 1HA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/22] | Representative(s) | Griffin, Kenneth David Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/42] | Griffin, Kenneth David Saunders & Dolleymore, 9, Rickmansworth Road Watford Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | ||
Former [2003/22] | Gregory, Timothy Mark T.M. Gregory & Co., 26 Cyril Street Northampton NN1 5EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01960972.6 | 29.08.2001 | [2003/22] | WO2001GB03850 | Priority number, date | GB20000021546 | 02.09.2000 Original published format: GB 0021546 | [2003/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0217765 | Date: | 07.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1313394 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A47K13/06 | [2003/22] | CPC: |
A47K13/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TOILETTENSITZ FÜR KINDER | [2003/22] | English: | TOILET SEAT FOR CHILDREN'S USE | [2003/22] | French: | SIEGE DE TOILETTES DESTINE AUX ENFANTS | [2003/22] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/22] | 04.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/42] | 02.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   04.10.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2069562 (KUO LUNG TSAI) [X] 1-3,5,7-15 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9413185 (DIETRICH PETER WERNER [AU]) [X] 1-5,7,9-15 * page 3, line 9 - page 4, line 26; figure - *; | [X]US5384917 (EPLING WILMA J [US]) [X] 1-3,9,10,14,15 * column 5, line 45 - column 6, line 36; figures 1-3 *; | [X]EP0978248 (MATSCHAK DIRK [DE]) [X] 1,2,4* the whole document *; | [X]DE20003410U (SCHWEREN BRIGITTE [DE]) [X] 1-4 * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 8; figure - * |