EP1304966 - SYSTEM FOR ENHANCED CHEMICAL DEBRIDEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 27.06.2007 [2007/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L.R.R & D Ltd. Hardoof Street 13 94965 Omer / IL | [2005/23] |
Former [2003/18] | For all designated states L.R. R & D Ltd. Hardoof Street 13 Omer 84965 / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSENBERG, Lior 13 Hardoof Street 84965 Omer / IL | [2003/18] | Representative(s) | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A., P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 01961058.3 | 30.07.2001 | [2003/18] | WO2001IL00703 | Priority number, date | IL20000137689 | 03.08.2000 Original published format: IL 13768900 | [2003/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0211624 | Date: | 14.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1304966 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1304966 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/22 | [2003/18] | CPC: |
A61B17/22004 (EP,US);
A61M1/98 (EP,US);
A61B17/2251 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00291 (EP,US);
A61M1/916 (EP,US);
A61N7/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM VERBESSERTEN CHEMISCHEN ENTFERNEN VON NEKROTISCHEM GEWEBE | [2003/18] | English: | SYSTEM FOR ENHANCED CHEMICAL DEBRIDEMENT | [2003/18] | French: | SYSTEME DE DEBRIDEMENT CHIMIQUE AMELIORE | [2003/18] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.02.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/18] | 23.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.06.2005 | BE | 08.06.2005 | CH | 08.06.2005 | ES | 08.06.2005 | FI | 08.06.2005 | LI | 08.06.2005 | NL | 08.06.2005 | TR | 08.06.2005 | CY | 30.07.2005 | LU | 30.07.2005 | MC | 31.07.2005 | IE | 02.08.2005 | DK | 08.09.2005 | GR | 08.09.2005 | SE | 08.09.2005 | PT | 14.11.2005 | [2007/26] |
Former [2007/20] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
CH | 08.06.2005 | ||
ES | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
LI | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
TR | 08.06.2005 | ||
CY | 30.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
IE | 02.08.2005 | ||
LU | 08.08.2005 | ||
DK | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
CH | 08.06.2005 | ||
ES | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
LI | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
TR | 08.06.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
IE | 02.08.2005 | ||
LU | 08.08.2005 | ||
DK | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
CH | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
LI | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
TR | 08.06.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
IE | 02.08.2005 | ||
DK | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
CH | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
LI | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
IE | 02.08.2005 | ||
DK | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
CH | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
LI | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
DK | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
CH | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
LI | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
DK | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
CH | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
LI | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
CH | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
LI | 08.06.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 08.06.2005 | |
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 08.09.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4982730 (LEWIS JR ROYCE C [US]) [A] 1 * column A; figure 1 *; | [A]US5618275 (BOCK ROBERT T [US]) [A] 1,10-13 * column 4, line 1 - line 42; figures 2A,2B *; | [Y]WO9832379 (TECHNION RES & DEV FOUNDATION [IL], et al) [Y] 1-7,10,11,13 * page 7, line 10 - line 19 * * page 14, line 22 - page 16, line 3; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO9853850 (LRR & D LTD [IL], et al) [Y] 1-7,10,11,13 * claims 1,2 *; | [A] - SCHAFER ET AL, "Experimental methods for ultrasonically enhanced wound healing", ULTRASONICS SYMPOSIUM, 1994. PROCEEDINGS., 1994 IEEE CANNES, FRANCE 1-4 NOV. 1994, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19941101), ISBN 0-7803-2012-3, pages 1853 - 1856, XP010139909 [A] 1 * column A * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ULTSYM.1994.401951 | [A] - KING W W K ET AL, "Debridement of burn wounds with a surgical ultrasonic aspirator", BURNS, (1996), vol. 22, no. 4, pages 307 - 309, XP001050524 [A] 1 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0305-4179(95)00141-7 | [A] - NICHTER L S ET AL, "Ultrasonic wound debridement", JOURNAL OF HAND SURGERY, (1988), vol. 13a, no. 1, pages 142 - 146, XP001050554 [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | US4372296 | US5656015 | FR2762791 |