EP1315378 - CONTENT DISTRIBUTION METHOD, RESERVATION MANAGEMENT DEVICE, AND PROGRAM STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2012/24] |
Former [2003/51] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2003/22] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIMURA, Takanori Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 02 /
IHARA, Keigo Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 03 /
YOSHIMINE, Takao Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 04 /
FUKUDA, Junko Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 05 /
SUEYOSHI, Takahiko Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [2012/24] |
Former [2003/22] | 01 /
NISHIMURA, Takanori Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | ||
02 /
IHARA, Keigo Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | |||
03 /
YOSHIMINE, Takao Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | |||
04 /
FUKUDA, Junko Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | |||
05 /
SUEYOSHI, Takahiko Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Representative(s) | Nicholls, Michael John J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2012/24] |
Former [2003/22] | Nicholls, Michael John J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01961165.6 | 29.08.2001 | [2003/22] | WO2001JP07418 | Priority number, date | JP20000264560 | 31.08.2000 Original published format: JP 2000264560 | [2003/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0219712 | Date: | 07.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1315378 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1315378 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.03.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/173, H04N5/44, G06F13/00, G06F15/00, H04L29/06 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
G06Q10/02 (EP,US);
G06F15/00 (KR);
H04L65/611 (EP,US);
H04L65/1101 (US);
H04L65/612 (EP,US);
H04L65/765 (EP,US);
H04N21/25883 (EP,US);
H04N21/41407 (EP,US);
H04N21/4143 (EP,US);
H04N21/4223 (EP,US);
H04N21/441 (EP,US);
H04N21/47214 (EP,US);
H04N21/6125 (EP,US);
H04N7/165 (EP,US);
H04N7/17327 (EP,US);
H04N21/4622 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/22] | H04N7/173, H04N5/44, G06F13/00, G06F15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2004/22] |
Former [2003/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | INHALTSVERTEILUNGSVERFAHREN, RESERVIERUNGS-VERWALTUNGSGERÄT UND PROGRAMMSPEICHERMEDIUM | [2003/22] | English: | CONTENT DISTRIBUTION METHOD, RESERVATION MANAGEMENT DEVICE, AND PROGRAM STORAGE MEDIUM | [2003/22] | French: | PROCEDE DE DISTRIBUTION DE CONTENU, DISPOSITIF DE GESTION DE RESERVATION, ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT DE PROGRAMME | [2003/22] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2002 | Translation filed | 06.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2002 | Search fee paid | 06.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2002 | Examination requested [2003/22] | 13.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.10.2005 | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.06.2012 | CH | 31.08.2012 | LI | 31.08.2012 | [2013/20] |
Former [2013/07] | AT | 13.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5583994 (RANGAN P VENKAT [US]) [A] 1-6 * abstract ** column 2, line 17 - line 58 *; | [A]US6041359 (BIRDWELL KENNETH J [US]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * column 2, line 15 - column 3, line 4 * | International search | [A]JPH0973480 (FUJITSU LTD); | [A]JPH11313237 (MINOLTA CO LTD) | by applicant | US5583994 | US6041359 |