EP1421716 - POLARISATION MODE DISPERSION COMPENSATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2008 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/41] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
Former [2004/22] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RASMUSSEN, Jens C., c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
ISHIKAWA, George, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2007/41] |
Former [2004/22] | 01 /
RASMUSSEN, Jens C., Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
02 /
ISHIKAWA, George, Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/22] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01961281.1 | 31.08.2001 | [2004/22] | WO2001JP07567 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03021821 | Date: | 13.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1421716 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1421716 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/18, G02B6/34 | [2004/22] | CPC: |
G02B6/2713 (EP,US);
G02B6/274 (EP,US);
G02B6/278 (EP,US);
H04B10/2569 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/22] | Title | German: | POLARISATIONSMODENDISPERSION-KOMPENSATOR | [2004/22] | English: | POLARISATION MODE DISPERSION COMPENSATOR | [2004/22] | French: | COMPENSATEUR DE DISPERSION DE MODE DE POLARISATION | [2004/22] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/22] | 19.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [E]US2002018267 (SUN FENGQING [US], et al) [E] 1,2,5,7 * abstract * * page 3, column L, paragraph 30 * * page 3, column R, line 1 - line 5 * * page 7, line 5 - line 32 * * claims 1-6 * * figure 6 * | [XAY] - PATSCHER J ET AL, "COMPONENT FOR SECOND-ORDER COMPENSATION OF POLARISATION-MODE DISPERSION", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, IEE STEVENAGE, GB, (19970619), vol. 33, no. 13, ISSN 0013-5194, pages 1157 - 1159, XP000734134 [X] 1-4,7 * the whole document * * figure 2 * [A] 6 [Y] 5 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:19970775 | [XY] - SANDEL D ET AL, "AUTOMATIC POLARISATION MODE DISPERSION COMPENSATION IN 40GBIT/S OPTICAL TRANSMISSION SYSTEM", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, IEE STEVENAGE, GB, (19981112), vol. 34, no. 23, ISSN 0013-5194, pages 2258 - 2259, XP000871255 [X] 1,2 * page 1, column R, line 12 - line 16 * * figure 2 * [Y] 5 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:19981526 | [XA] - Q. YU; L.S. YAN; Y. XIE; M. HAUER; A.E WILLNER, "Higher Order Polarization Mode Dispersion Compensation Using a Fixed Time Delay Followed by a Variable Time Delay", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, (200108), vol. 13, no. 8, pages 863 - 865, XP002197429 [X] 1,2,5-7 * page 863, column L, line 26 - column R, line 3 * * page 863, column R, line 28 - line 36 * * figures 1,3 * [A] 3,4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/68.935829 |