EP1309577 - HETEROCYCLIC SULFONAMIDE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE FOR POTENTIATING GLUTAMATE RECEPTOR FUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.2007 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.07.2007 [2007/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/20] | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, Indiana 46285 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENDER, David, Michael 10543 Fawn Ridge Lane Indianapolis, IN 46236 / US | 02 /
FORMAN, Scott, Louis 5731 Castle Hill Drive, Apart. 725 Indianapolis, IN 46250 / US | 03 /
JONES, Winton, Dennis 1227 East 126th Street Carmel, IN 46033 / US | 04 /
SMITH, Daryl, Lynn 11830 Ashton Drive Fishers Indiana 46038 / US | 05 /
ZARRINMAYEH, Hamideh 924 Sable Run Carmel, IN 46032 / US | 06 /
ZIMMERMAN, Dennis, Michael 10343 Oak Ridge Drive Zionsville, IN 46077 / US | [2003/26] |
Former [2003/20] | 01 /
BENDER, David, Michael 10543 Fawn Ridge Lane Indianapolis, IN 46236 / US | ||
02 /
FORMAN, Scott, Louis 5731 Castle Hill Drive, Apart. 725 Indianapolis, IN 46250 / US | |||
03 /
JONES, Winton, Dennis 1227 East 126th Street Carmel, IN 46033 / US | |||
04 /
SMITH, Daryl, Lynn 7656 Madden Lane Fishers, IN 46038 / US | |||
05 /
ZARRINMAYEH, Hamideh 924 Sable Run Carmel, IN 46032 / US | |||
06 /
ZIMMERMAN, Dennis, Michael 10343 Oak Ridge Drive Zionsville, IN 46077 / US | Representative(s) | Suarez-Miles, Ana Sanchiz, et al Eli Lilly and Company Limited Lilly Research Centre Erl Wood Manor Sunninghill Road Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/08] | Suarez-Miles, Ana Sanchiz, et al Eli Lilly and Company Limited Lilly Research Centre Erl Wood Manor Sunninghill Road Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | ||
Former [2003/20] | Kingsbury, Oliver William Eli Lilly and Company Limited, Erl Wood Manor, Sunninghill Road Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 01961615.0 | 27.07.2001 | [2003/20] | WO2001US21121 | Priority number, date | US20000224573P | 11.08.2000 Original published format: US 224573 P | [2003/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0214294 | Date: | 21.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1309577 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07D277/68, A61K31/395, A61P43/00, C07D263/58, C07D209/34, C07D215/22, C07D233/26 | [2003/20] | CPC: |
C07D215/227 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D209/34 (EP,US);
C07D235/26 (EP,US);
C07D263/58 (EP,US);
C07D277/68 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HETEROZYKLISCHE SULFONAMID DERIVATE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER GLUTAMAT REZEPTOR FUNKTION | [2003/20] | English: | HETEROCYCLIC SULFONAMIDE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE FOR POTENTIATING GLUTAMATE RECEPTOR FUNCTION | [2003/20] | French: | DERIVES SULFONAMIDES HETEROCYCLIQUES | [2003/20] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.02.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/20] | 01.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/30] | 12.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0976744 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [A] 1,12-17 * example -; claims 1,15 *; | [PX]WO0066546 (LILLY CO ELI [US], et al) [PX] 1-17 * example 46; claim - * |