EP1307280 - UNSUPPORTED MULTIZONE MICROPOROUS MEMBRANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 27.06.2008 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2006/34] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2005/47] | For all designated states Cuno Incorporated 400 Research Parkway Meriden Connecticut 06450 / US | ||
Former [2003/19] | For all designated states Cuno Incorporated 400 Research Parkway Meriden Connecticut 06450 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SALE, Richard 35 Marbella Lane Tolland, CT 08084 / US | 02 /
OSTREICHER, Eugene 9 Reservation Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2003/19] | Representative(s) | Charig, Raymond Julian Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/19] | Charig, Raymond Julian Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 01961936.0 | 07.08.2001 | [2003/19] | WO2001US24724 | Priority number, date | US20000223359P | 07.08.2000 Original published format: US 223359 P | [2003/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0211868 | Date: | 14.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1307280 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1307280 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B01D67/00, B01D69/12, B01D69/02 | [2003/19] | CPC: |
B01D67/0018 (EP,US);
B01D69/02 (EP,US);
B01D69/1216 (EP,US);
B01D71/34 (EP,US);
B01D71/56 (EP,US);
B01D71/68 (EP,US);
B29C41/32 (EP,US);
B32B5/32 (EP,US);
B01D2323/18 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2003/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | SELBSTTRAGENDE MEHSCHICHTIGE MIKROPORÖSE MEMBRAN | [2003/19] | English: | UNSUPPORTED MULTIZONE MICROPOROUS MEMBRANE | [2003/19] | French: | MEMBRANE MICROPOREUSE A ZONES MULTIPLES SANS SUPPORT | [2003/19] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.01.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/19] | 04.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.08.2006
27.02.2008
WITHDRAWN Millipore Corporation 290 Concord Road Billerica, Massachusetts 01821-3405 / US Opponent's representative Brown, David Leslie, et al, et al Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/14] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.08.2006
27.02.2008
WITHDRAWN Millipore Corporation 290 Concord Road Billerica, Massachusetts 01821-3405 / US Opponent's representative Brown, David Leslie, et al, et al HASELTINE LAKE Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2006/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.08.2006
WITHDRAWN Millipore Corporation 290 Concord Road Billerica, Massachusetts 01821-3405 / US Opponent's representative Brown, David Leslie, et al, et al HASELTINE LAKE, Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | 27.09.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 01.06.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.03.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.05.2008 | 12.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 12.03.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 22.03.2008 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2008/31] | 08.05.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4489671 (CHOINSKI EDWARD J [US]); | [Y]US5620790 (HOLZKI UDO [DE], et al); | [AD]US6090441 (VINING JR JACK H [US], et al) |