EP1337823 - WEBBING TENSION SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CASCO PRODUCTS CORPORATION 380 Horace Street Bridgeport CT 06610 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/35] | For all designated states CASCO PRODUCTS CORPORATION 380 Horace Street Bridgeport CT 06610 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAWSON, Richard 46 Boulevard Newtown, NY 06470 / US | [2003/35] | Representative(s) | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2003/35] | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco HERRERO & ASOCIADOS, S.L. Alcalá, 35 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 01962239.8 | 17.08.2001 | [2003/35] | WO2001US25795 | Priority number, date | US20000725390 | 29.11.2000 Original published format: US 725390 | [2003/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0244679 | Date: | 06.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1337823 | Date: | 27.08.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.06.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01L5/04, G01L1/26, B60R21/01 | [2005/29] | CPC: |
G01L5/101 (EP,US);
G01L5/04 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2003/35] | G01L5/04, G01L1/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, TR [2004/22] |
Former [2003/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEWEBEANSPANNUNGSSENSOR | [2003/35] | English: | WEBBING TENSION SENSOR | [2003/35] | French: | CAPTEUR DE TENSION DE SANGLE | [2003/35] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2003 | Search fee paid | 27.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/35] | 09.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/31] | 30.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.01.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 17.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 16.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 21.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | 15   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9912012 (BREED AUTOMOTIVE TECH [US]) [X] 8,14 * abstract *; | [X]US5960523 (HUSBY HARALD SNORRE [US], et al) [X] 8,14* abstract *; | [X]US6081759 (HUSBY HARALD SNORRE [US], et al) [X] 8,14 * abstract * | International search | [A]US4663862 (GORISSEN ERICH [DE]); | [A]US5369425 (BALZEIT RALF [DE], et al); | [X]US5871063 (YOUNG JAMES M [US]); | [A]US6185914 (MACKIE LAURIE ROBERT [CA]) |