EP1303827 - A SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING VENTILATOR INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.10.2011 [2011/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Draeger Medical Systems, Inc. 16 Electronics Avenue Danvers, MA 01923 / US | [2004/06] |
Former [2003/17] | For all designated states Siemens Medical Solutions USA, Inc. 186 Wood Avenue South Iselin, NJ 08830-2770 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANETTA, Amy, M. 32 Brandon Street North Billerica, MA 01862 / US | [2003/17] | Representative(s) | Wilding, Frances Ward Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/17] | Wilding, Frances Ward Haseltine Lake & Co Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 01962286.9 | 27.08.2001 | [2003/17] | WO2001US26721 | Priority number, date | US20000248087P | 13.11.2000 Original published format: US 248087 P | US20010805970 | 14.03.2001 Original published format: US 805970 | [2003/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0239366 | Date: | 16.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1303827 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00, A61B5/00, A61M16/00 | [2003/17] | CPC: |
A61M16/021 (EP,US);
G16H40/67 (EP,US);
A61M2205/502 (EP,US);
A61M2205/584 (EP,US);
G16H40/63 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNG VON BEATMUNGSGERÄTEN | [2003/17] | English: | A SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING VENTILATOR INFORMATION | [2003/17] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ASSOCIEES A UN VENTILATEUR | [2003/17] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/17] | 23.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/42] | 31.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.10.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | SE9901688 [ ] (ANEO AB (SE)); | [A]US5687717 (HALPERN ARIEH S [US], et al) [A] 1,12,23,27 * column 8, line 34 - line 50; figure 7 *; | [A]WO9850095 (COMPUMEDICS SLEEP PTY LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1,12,23,27 * page 4, line 5 - page 6, line 2; figure 2 * * page 9, line 11 - page 10, line 8 *; | [A]US5921920 (MARSHALL BRYAN E [US], et al) [A] 1,12,23,27* column 9, line 34 - line 64; figures 2-4 *; | [XA]WO0067820 (ANEO AB [SE], et al) [X] 23,26,27 * page 17, line 1 - line 12; figures 2,5 * * page 14, line 21 - line 28 * [A] 1,12 | Examination | WO9947200 | US6080106 |