EP1278606 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR REELING UP IN THE PROPER POSITION A HOT-ROLLED STRIP IN A REELING INSTALLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.2005 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Betriebsforschungsinstitut VDEh Institut für angewandte Forschung GmbH Sohnstrasse 65 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Stahl AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Strasse 100 47166 Duisburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/19] | For all designated states Betriebsforschungsinstitut VDEh Institut für angewandte Forschung GmbH Sohnstrasse 65 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Stahl AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Strasse 100 47166 Duisburg / DE | |||
Former [2005/17] | For all designated states Betriesforschungsinstitut VDEh Institut für angewandte Forschung GmbH Sohnstrasse 65 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Stahl AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Strasse 100 47166 Duisburg / DE | |||
Former [2003/05] | For all designated states BFI VDEh- Institut für angewandte Forschung GmbH Sohnstrasse 65 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Stahl AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Strasse 100 47166 Duisburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÜLLER, Ulrich Maria-Montessori-Strasse 59 40789 Monheim / DE | 02 /
WOLFF, Andreas Kaiserstrasse 34a 40479 Düsseldorf / DE | 03 /
THIEMANN, Gerd Kassenberger Strasse 168b 44879 Bochum / DE | 04 /
DEGNER, Michael Wunnenbergstrasse 12 44229 Dortmund / DE | [2003/05] | Representative(s) | König, Gregor Sebastian, et al König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 09 46 40509 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | König, Gregor Sebastian, et al König Szynka Tilmann von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 11 09 46 40509 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2003/05] | König, Gregor, Dipl. Ing., et al König Szynka von Renesse, Lohengrinstrasse 11 40549 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 01962413.9 | 22.03.2001 | [2003/05] | WO2001EP03251 | Priority number, date | DE2000114813 | 27.03.2000 Original published format: DE 10014813 | [2003/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0172444 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1278606 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1278606 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B21C47/34, B21C47/02 | [2003/05] | CPC: |
B21C47/34 (EP,US);
B21B39/00 (KR);
B21B37/68 (EP,US);
B21B39/006 (EP,US);
B21C47/3425 (EP,US);
B21B2015/0057 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, IT, SE [2004/20] |
Former [2003/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM LAGEGERECHTEN AUFWICKELN EINES GEWALZTEN WARMBANDES IN EINER HASPELVORRICHTUNG | [2003/05] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR REELING UP IN THE PROPER POSITION A HOT-ROLLED STRIP IN A REELING INSTALLATION | [2003/05] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT D'ENROULER UN FEUILLARD LAMINE A CHAUD DANS UNE POSITION CORRECTE, DANS UN DISPOSITIF D'ENROULEMENT | [2003/05] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/05] | 23.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE3828356 (BETR FORSCH INST ANGEW FORSCH [DE]) [AD] 1,10,11 * column 1, lines 40-60; figure 1 *; | [AD]EP0864847 (BETR FORSCH INST ANGEW FORSCH [DE], et al) [AD] 1,4,11,12 * column 3, lines 29-47; claim 7 * * column 4, lines 52-57; figure 4 *; | [A]US5964114 (NOE ROLF [DE], et al) [A] 1,11 * column 8, line 30 - column 9, line 15; figure 6 *; | [A]JPS59183930 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850222), vol. 009, no. 042, Database accession no. (M - 359), & JP59183930 A 19841019 (SUMITOMO KINZOKU KOGYO KK) [A] 1,11 * abstract * |