EP1294950 - DIAGNOSIS OF DISEASES ASSOCIATED WITH DEVELOPMENT GENES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2011 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] | 18.02.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Epigenomics AG Kleine Präsidentenstraße 1 10178 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/13] | For all designated states Epigenomics AG Kleine Präsidentenstrasse 1 10178 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2003/13] | For all designated states Epigenomics AG Kastanienallee 24 10435 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLEK, Alexander Schröderstrasse 13/2 10115 Berlin / DE | 02 /
PIEPENBROCK, Christian Schwartzkopffstrasse 7 B 10115 Berlin / DE | 03 /
BERLIN, Kurt Marienkäferweg 4 14532 Stahnsdorf / DE | [2003/13] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2010/30] |
Former [2005/09] | Krauss, Jan Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/13] | Schohe, Stefan Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01962813.0 | 02.07.2001 | [2003/13] | WO2001EP07536 | Priority number, date | DE2000132529 | 30.06.2000 Original published format: DE 10032529 | DE2000143826 | 01.09.2000 Original published format: DE 10043826 | [2003/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0200927 | Date: | 03.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1294950 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, B01J19/00, G01N33/483 | [2003/13] | CPC: |
C07K14/82 (EP,US);
C07K14/4703 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
C12Q2523/125 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/154 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIAGNOSE VON MIT ENTWICKLUNGS-GENEN ASSOZIIERTEN ERKRANKUNGEN MITTELS ERMITTLUNGIHRES METHYLIERUNGSZUSTANDES | [2003/13] | English: | DIAGNOSIS OF DISEASES ASSOCIATED WITH DEVELOPMENT GENES | [2003/13] | French: | DIAGNOSTIC DE TROUBLES LIES A DES GENES DE DEVELOPPEMENT | [2003/13] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/13] | 06.03.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.02.2006 | 01.02.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 03.02.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/12] | 07.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: A.110(2) in appeal | 19.01.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/12] | 19.01.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/12] | Appeal following examination | 27.04.2006 | Appeal received No. T1783/06 | 26.07.2006 | Statement of grounds filed | 19.01.2011 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | EP06002091.4 / EP1676927 | Request for further processing for: | 19.01.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 19.01.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.02.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]US5744305 (FODOR STEPHEN P A [US], et al) [AD] 9,11-15 * column 6, line 5 * * claims 1,8,15,20,26 * * figure 14 *; | [YD]WO9928498 (EPIGENOMICS GMBH [DE], et al) [YD] 1-31 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9929898 (MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT [DE], et al) [A] 24-27 * page 10, line 19 - page 15, line 21 *; | [Y]DE19905082 (EPIGENOMICS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-31 * the whole document *; | [E]WO0168912 (EPIGENOMICS AG [DE], et al) [E] 1,3-31 * claims 1,3-32 * * SEQ ID NO. 513 *; | [E]WO0168911 (EPIGENOMICS AG [DE], et al) [E] 1,3-31 * claims 1,3-32 * * SEQ ID NO. 389 *; | [E]WO0177377 (EPIGENOMICS AG [DE], et al) [E] 1,3-31 * claims 1,3-32 * * SEQ ID NO. 71 *; | [E]WO0177375 (EPIGENOMICS AG [DE], et al) [E] 1,3-31 * claims 1,3-32 * * SEQ ID NO. 205 *; | [E]WO0177376 (EPIGENOMICS AG [DE], et al) [E] 1,3-31 * claims 1,3-32 * * SEQ ID NO. 48 *; | [X] - BENDER CM ET AL., "Roles of cell division and gene transcription in the methylation of CpG islands.", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, (199910), vol. 19, no. 10, pages 6690 - 6698, XP002185033 [X] 1 * page 6691, column R, paragraph 3 - page 6692, column L, paragraph 1 * | [X] - TOKUHARA M ET AL., "Molecular cloning of the human frizzled-6", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (1998), vol. 243, pages 622 - 627, XP002185034 [X] 1 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1998.8143 | [XY] - WATERSTON RH, "The sequence of Homo sapiens clone"", EMBL, EBI, (19991115), Database accession no. AC013731, URL: HTTP://WWW.EBI.AC.UK/CGI-BIN/EMBLFETCH, XP002185035 [X] 1,30,31 * the whole document * [Y] 3-29 | [XY] - BOECKELMANN R ET AL., "Gene expression in psoriatic skin.", EMBL, EBI, (20000502), Database accession no. AF143346, URL: HTTP://WWW.EBI.AC.UK/CGI-BIN/EMBLFETCH, XP002185036 [X] 1,30,31 * the whole document * [Y] 3-29 | [T] - BÖCKELMANN R ET AL, "'Suprabasal overexpression of the hsBPB7 gene in psoriatic epidermis as identified by reverse transcriptase-polymerase chain reaction differential display model comparing Psoriasis plaque tissue with peritonsillar mucosa.", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY, (200102), vol. 158, no. 2, pages 367 - 372 [T] 1 * page 369, column L, paragraph 2 * * table 1 * | [X] - KOHARA Y ET AL, "Caenorhabditis elegans cDNA clone:yk578b10", EMBL, EBI, (19990719), Database accession no. AV200626, URL: HTTP://WWW.EBI.AC.UK/CGI-BIN/EMBLFETCH, XP002185759 [X] 3 * the whole document * | [AD] - GRIGG G AND CLARK S, "Sequencing 5-methylcytosine residues in genomic DNA", BIOESSAYS, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (199406), vol. 16, no. 6, ISSN 0265-9247, pages 431 - 436, XP002106411 [AD] 1-31 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bies.950160612 |