EP1311566 - VINYLIDENE FLUORIDE POLYMERS, PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING THEM AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOLVAY (Société Anonyme) Rue du Prince Albert, 33 1050 Bruxelles / BE | [2003/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANNUZEL, Thierry Avenue du Kouter 32 B-1160 Brussels / BE | 02 /
MEUNIER, Vincent 1202 Willard Street Houston, TX 77006 / US | 03 /
FAIG, Régis 8, rue des Acacias F-39100 Baverans / FR | 04 /
VIDBERG, Olivier 24, avenue Clémenceau F-39500 Tavaux / FR | [2003/21] | Representative(s) | Jacques, Philippe, et al Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Industrielle Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/21] | Jacques, Philippe, et al Solvay S.A. Département Propriété Industrielle 310, rue de Ransbeek 1120 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 01962876.7 | 26.07.2001 | [2003/21] | WO2001EP08645 | Priority number, date | FR20000010169 | 31.07.2000 Original published format: FR 0010169 | [2003/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0210233 | Date: | 07.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1311566 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1311566 | Date: | 16.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C08F214/22, C08F214/24, C08F214/28 | [2003/21] | CPC: |
C08F214/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VINYLIDENFLUORIDEPOLYMERE, DEREN HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND VERWENDUNG | [2009/12] | English: | VINYLIDENE FLUORIDE POLYMERS, PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING THEM AND USE THEREOF | [2003/21] | French: | POLYMERES DE FLUORURE DE VINYLIDENE, PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ET UTILISATION DE CES POLYMERES | [2003/21] |
Former [2003/21] | VINYLIDENFLORIDEPOLYMERE, DEREN HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND VERWENDUNG | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/21] | 21.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.09.2009 | BE | 16.09.2009 | CY | 16.09.2009 | DK | 16.09.2009 | FI | 16.09.2009 | IT | 16.09.2009 | NL | 16.09.2009 | SE | 16.09.2009 | TR | 16.09.2009 | GR | 17.12.2009 | ES | 27.12.2009 | PT | 18.01.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2011/14] | AT | 16.09.2009 | |
BE | 16.09.2009 | ||
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
DK | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
IT | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
GR | 17.12.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 16.09.2009 | |
BE | 16.09.2009 | ||
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
DK | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
GR | 17.12.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 16.09.2009 | |
BE | 16.09.2009 | ||
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
DK | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 16.09.2009 | |
BE | 16.09.2009 | ||
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | BE | 16.09.2009 | |
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | CY | 16.09.2009 | |
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | CY | 16.09.2009 | |
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | CY | 16.09.2009 | |
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | FI | 16.09.2009 | |
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | FI | 16.09.2009 | |
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | SE | 16.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2323711 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1,7,11,12* page 1, line 32 - page 2, line 7 *; | [X]EP0131203 (MONTEDISON SPA [IT]) [X] 1-4,7,11,12 * page 17 - page 18 * * page 1, line 24 - page 2, line 8 * |