EP1311817 - MEDICAL THERMOMETER AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A MEDICAL THERMOMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2006 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2007 | Request for preliminary examination | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microlife Intellectual Property GmbH Max Schmidheiny-Strasse 201 9435 Heerbrugg / CH | [2003/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRUNVOLL, Morten Blättlerstrasse 8 CH-9442 Berneck / CH | [2003/21] | Representative(s) | Müller, Christoph Emanuel, et al Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/21] | Müller, Christoph Emanuel, et al Hepp, Wenger & Ryffel AG, Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | Application number, filing date | 01962935.1 | 11.08.2001 | [2003/21] | WO2001EP09302 | Priority number, date | EP20000810750 | 23.08.2000 Original published format: EP 00810750 | [2003/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0216899 | Date: | 28.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1311817 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01K13/00 | [2003/21] | CPC: |
G01K13/00 (KR);
G01K13/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHES THERMOMETER UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2003/21] | English: | MEDICAL THERMOMETER AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A MEDICAL THERMOMETER | [2003/21] | French: | THERMOMETRE MEDICAL ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2003/21] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/21] | 15.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/08] | 26.09.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9216821 (GERABERGER THERMOMETERWERK GMB [DE]) [A] 1,3,10,14,17 * figure 3 *; | [A]EP0171769 (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [A] 1,14 * page 6, line 15 - page 7, line 21; figure - *; | [A]US6068399 (TSENG CHAO-MAN [TW]) [A] 1,6-9 * the whole document *; | [DA]JPH10221176 | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981130), vol. 1998, no. 13, & JP10221176 A 19980821 (TOSHIBA GLASS CO LTD) [DA] 1,14 * abstract * | Examination | FR2526280 | GB2262168 | FR2767656 |