EP1312098 - BEACON SYSTEM WITH ENHANCED INSULATION AND SEALING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ets. AUGIER S.A. Z.I. 1ère Avenue No 2243 F-06516 Carros Cédex / FR | [2003/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEBEL, Patrick Hameau du Soleil No6 F-06270 Villeuve Loubet / FR | [2003/21] | Representative(s) | de Zeeuw, Johan Diederick Murgitroyd & Company Immeuble Atlantis 55, Allée Pierre Ziller Sophia Antipolis 06560 Valbonne / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/28] | de Zeeuw, Johan Diederick Murgitroyd & Company, Immeuble Atlantis 55, Allée Pierre Ziller, Sophia Antipolis 06560 Valbonne / FR | ||
Former [2003/21] | Bonneau, Gérard Cabinet Bonneau, Les Taissounières HB 3, 1681, Route des Dolines 06560 Sophia Antipolis / FR | Application number, filing date | 01963062.3 | 03.08.2001 | [2003/21] | WO2001FR02551 | Priority number, date | FR20000010409 | 04.08.2000 Original published format: FR 0010409 | [2003/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0213213 | Date: | 14.02.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1312098 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01F38/30, H01F38/32, H01F27/04 | [2003/21] | CPC: |
H01F27/04 (EP,US);
H01F38/30 (EP,US);
H01F38/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | 21.02.2003 | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 21.02.2003 | SI | 21.02.2003 | Title | German: | BEFEUERUNGSANLAGE MIT VERSTÄRKER-ISOLIERUNG UND -DICHTUNG | [2003/21] | English: | BEACON SYSTEM WITH ENHANCED INSULATION AND SEALING | [2003/21] | French: | SYSTEME DE BALISAGE A ISOLATION ET ETANCHEITE RENFORCEES | [2003/21] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/21] | 01.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/35] | 08.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2160368 (STANDARD TELEPHONES CABLES LTD) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]EP0196249 (AUGIER SA [FR]) [A] 1,7 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]DE29501351U (INPROTEC INNOVATIVE PRODUKTION [DE]) [A] 1,7 * page 1, paragraph 1; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0836260 (ULMA HORMIGON POLIMERO S COOP [ES]) [A] 1,7 * figures 1,12; claim 1 *; | [A]DE29909011U (HOLZER WALTER [DE]) [A] 1,7 * page 3, lines 23,24, paragraph 6 * * page 1, paragraph 1; figures 1-4; claims 1,5 * |