EP1313687 - PRODUCTION OF HYDROFLUOROALKANES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2006 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ineos Fluor Holdings Limited First Floor Offices Queens Gate 15-17 Queens Terrace Southampton, Hampshire SO14 3BP / GB | [2006/04] |
Former [2003/22] | For all designated states Ineos Fluor Holdings Limited First Floor Offices Queens Gate 15-17 Queens Terrace Southampton, Hampshire SO14 3BP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIDDIS, Clive, Robert 45 Station Road, Delamere Northwich, Cheshire CW8 2HU / GB | 02 /
STEWART, Paul, Hendry 2 Kenwick Close, Great Sutton Ellesmere Port, Cheshire CH66 2HY / GB | [2003/22] | Representative(s) | Crowhurst, Charlotte Waveney, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/22] | Crowhurst, Charlotte Waveney, et al Eric Potter Clarkson Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 01963217.3 | 03.09.2001 | [2003/22] | WO2001GB03945 | Priority number, date | GB20000021618 | 02.09.2000 Original published format: GB 0021618 | [2003/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0218304 | Date: | 07.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1313687 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1313687 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07C19/08, C07C17/20, C07C17/04, C07C19/12 | [2003/22] | CPC: |
C07C19/08 (EP,US);
C07C17/20 (KR);
C07C17/04 (EP,US);
C07C17/206 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C17/04, C07C19/12 (EP,US);
C07C17/206, C07C19/08 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON FLUORKOHLENWASSERSTOFFEN | [2003/22] | English: | PRODUCTION OF HYDROFLUOROALKANES | [2003/22] | French: | PRODUCTION D'HYDROFLUOROALCANES | [2003/22] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/22] | 04.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.01.2006 | CH | 25.01.2006 | CY | 25.01.2006 | FI | 25.01.2006 | LI | 25.01.2006 | TR | 25.01.2006 | DK | 25.04.2006 | SE | 25.04.2006 | GR | 26.04.2006 | PT | 26.06.2006 | LU | 03.09.2006 | IE | 04.09.2006 | MC | 30.09.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 25.01.2006 | |
CH | 25.01.2006 | ||
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
TR | 25.01.2006 | ||
DK | 25.04.2006 | ||
SE | 25.04.2006 | ||
GR | 26.04.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
LU | 03.09.2006 | ||
IE | 04.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 25.01.2006 | |
CH | 25.01.2006 | ||
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
DK | 25.04.2006 | ||
SE | 25.04.2006 | ||
GR | 26.04.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
IE | 04.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 25.01.2006 | |
CH | 25.01.2006 | ||
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
DK | 25.04.2006 | ||
SE | 25.04.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
IE | 04.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/42] | AT | 25.01.2006 | |
CH | 25.01.2006 | ||
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
IT | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
DK | 25.04.2006 | ||
SE | 25.04.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
IE | 04.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 25.01.2006 | |
CH | 25.01.2006 | ||
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
IT | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
DK | 25.04.2006 | ||
SE | 25.04.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 25.01.2006 | |
CH | 25.01.2006 | ||
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
DK | 25.04.2006 | ||
SE | 25.04.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 25.01.2006 | |
CH | 25.01.2006 | ||
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
SE | 25.04.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | AT | 25.01.2006 | |
CH | 25.01.2006 | ||
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
SE | 25.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 25.01.2006 | |
CH | 25.01.2006 | ||
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | CH | 25.01.2006 | |
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 25.01.2006 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0396168 (PCR [US]) [Y] 1-13 * example 1 *; | [Y]WO9216481 (DU PONT [US]) [Y] 1-13 * claim 1 *; | [Y]WO9219576 (DU PONT [US]) [Y] 1-13 * claim 1 *; | [Y]WO9613476 (ICI PLC [GB], et al) [Y] 1-13 * examples 5,6; claim 1 *; | [Y]WO9821171 (ALLIED SIGNAL INC [US]) [Y] 1-13 * claim 1 *; | [Y]EP0957074 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-13 * page 3, line 28 - line 36; claim - *; | [Y]US6165931 (RAO V N MALLIKARJUNA [US]) [Y] 1-13* example 11 * |