EP1572638 - AN IMPROVED PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF AMORPHOUS ATORVASTATIN CALCIUM SALT (2:1) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.2014 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Morepen Laboratories Ltd. 416-418, Antriksh Bhawan, 4th Floor, 22, K.G. Marg New Delhi 110 001 Maharashtra / IN | [2005/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SURI, Sanjay 416-418, Antriksh Bhawan, 4th Floor, 22, K.G. Marg New Delhi 110001 / IN | 02 /
SINGH, J. 416-418, Antriksh Bhawan, 4th Floor, 22, K.G. Marg New Delhi 110001 / IN | 03 /
SARIN, G., S. 416-418, Antriksh Bhawan, 4th Floor, 22, K.G. Marg New Delhi 110001 / IN | 04 /
BANSAL, B., R. 416-418, Antriksh Bhawan, 4th Floor, 22, K.G. Marg New Delhi 110001 / IN | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/37] | Goddar, Heinz J., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01963365.0 | 31.08.2001 | [2005/37] | WO2001IN00152 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03018547 | Date: | 06.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1572638 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.02.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07D207/34, C07D405/06, A61K31/40, A61P3/06 | [2010/18] | CPC: |
C07D207/416 (EP,US);
A61P3/06 (EP);
C07D207/34 (EP,US);
C07D405/06 (EP,US);
C07D409/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/13] | C07D207/34 | ||
Former IPC [2005/37] | C07D201/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2005/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON AMORPHEM ATORVASTATIN-CALCIUMSALZ (2:1) | [2005/37] | English: | AN IMPROVED PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF AMORPHOUS ATORVASTATIN CALCIUM SALT (2:1) | [2005/37] | French: | PROCEDE AMELIORE DE PREPARATION D'UN SEL D'ATORVASTATINE CALCIQUE AMORPHE (2:1) | [2005/37] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2004 | Search fee paid | 06.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2004 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 31.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/36] | 23.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.03.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | 12   M06   Fee paid on   13.11.2012 | 31.08.2013 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0144181 (WARNER LAMBERT RES & DEV IE [IE], et al) [X] 1-3 * page 1 - page 9 *; | [E]WO0243667 (TEVA PHARMA [IL], et al) [E] 1-3 * claim - *; | [E]WO02051804 (CIBA SC HOLDING AG [CH], et al) [E] 1* page 9 - page 10; example 8; claim - * | International search | [A]US6087511 (LIN MIN [US], et al); | [A]WO0071116 (RANBAXY LAB LTD [IN], et al) | Examination | US5273995 | WO0142209 |