EP1417362 - YARN OF ETHYLENE/TETRAFLUOROETHYLENE COPOLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington DE 19898 / US | ||
Former [2004/20] | For all designated states E.I.Du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, Deleware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOKARSKY, Edward, William 3 The Horseshoe Newark, DE 19711 / US | [2004/20] | Representative(s) | Matthews, Derek Peter Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Matthews, Derek Peter Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2004/20] | Matthews, Derek Peter Frank B. Dehn & Co., 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01963775.0 | 03.08.2001 | [2004/20] | WO2001US24296 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03014438 | Date: | 20.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1417362 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | D01F6/32, D01F1/06, A61C15/04, A01K91/00 | [2004/20] | CPC: |
D01F6/32 (EP,KR);
A01K91/00 (EP);
D01F6/30 (EP);
A61C15/041 (EP);
H05K1/0366 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GARN AUS ETHYLEN-TETRAFLUOROETHYLEN-COPOLYMEREN | [2004/20] | English: | YARN OF ETHYLENE/TETRAFLUOROETHYLENE COPOLYMER | [2004/20] | French: | FIL DE COPOLYMERE ETHYLENIQUE/TETRAFLUOROETHYLENIQUE | [2004/20] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 06.05.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/39] | 08.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS5352727 ; | [A]JPS5352728 ; | [DA]DE4131746 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [DA] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [DA]JPS63219616 ; | [DA]WO0044967 (DU PONT [US], et al) [DA] 9-12 * the whole document * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1978, no. 25, Database accession no. 1978-44970A, XP002138971 & JPS5352727 A 19780513 (TOSHIBA MACHINE CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1978, no. 25, Database accession no. 1978-44971A, XP002195570 & JPS5352728 A 19780513 (TOSHIBA MACHINE CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | [A] - KRONFEL'D A M ET AL, "SOME ASPECTS OF SPINNING FIBRES FROM FLUORINE-CONTAINING COPOLYMERS BY MELT EXTRUSION", FIBRE CHEMISTRY, CONSULTANTS BUREAU. NEW YORK, US, (19861101), vol. 18, no. 2, ISSN 0015-0541, pages 104 - 107, XP002080875 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00549623 | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890113), vol. 013, no. 015, Database accession no. (C - 559), & JP63219616 A 19880913 (SHOWA KOGYO KK;OTHERS: 01) [DA] 1-15 * abstract * |