EP1363784 - MEANS FOR ENHANCING PRINT COLOR DENSITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.2006 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.01.2007 [2007/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/48] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISSING, Nicholas, James 4702 Williamsburg Road Cincinnati, OH 45215 / US | 02 /
ELAM, Mary, Elizabeth 610 Beechwood Road Wilmington, OH 45177 / US | [2003/48] | Representative(s) | Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/48] | Kremer, Véronique, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 01963974.9 | 14.08.2001 | [2003/48] | WO2001US25390 | Priority number, date | US20000638237 | 14.08.2000 Original published format: US 638237 | [2003/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0214079 | Date: | 21.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1363784 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B41M1/00 | [2003/48] | CPC: |
B42D15/0093 (EP,US);
G06F3/12 (KR);
B41M1/36 (EP,US);
B41M5/0041 (EP,US);
B41M5/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MITTEL ZUM ERHÖHEN DER DRUCKFARBENDICHTE | [2003/48] | English: | MEANS FOR ENHANCING PRINT COLOR DENSITY | [2003/48] | French: | MOYEN D'ACCROISSEMENT DE LA DENSITE DE COULEURS D'UNE IMPRESSION | [2003/48] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/48] | 13.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/03] | 01.09.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO9954143 (STANFORD RES INST INT [US]) [X] 1-3,7-9 * see abstract; page 1, line 6 - page 21, line 20 * [Y] 4-6,10; | [YD]US6096412 (MCFARLAND JAMES ROBERT [US], et al) [YD] 4,6,10 * see abstract; column 4, line 56 - column 19, line 11 *; | [Y]EP0417368 (WESTVACO CORP [US]) [Y] 5 * see abstract; column 2, line 7 - column 4, line 44; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5503076 (YEO RICHARD S [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0414015 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US5695855 (YEO RICHARD SWEE-CHYE [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |