EP1329099 - DISPLAYING ADVERTISING IN AN INTERACTIVE PROGRAM GUIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/30] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DISPLAYING ADVERTISING IN AN INTERACTIVE PROGRAM GUIDE | ||
[2008/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corporate Media Partners D/B/A Americast 300 S. Riverside, 18th Floor Chicago, IL 60606 / US | [2008/44] |
Former [2003/30] | For all designated states Corporate Media Partners D/B/A Americast 300 S. Riverside, 18th Floor Chicago, IL 60606 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GERBA, George 1338 Treston Way Venice, CA 90291 / US | 02 /
NICHOLS, Michael, R. 1523 East Mendocino Street Altadena, CA 91001 / US | [2003/30] | Representative(s) | Hackett, Sean James Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/30] | Hackett, Sean James Marks & Clerk, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 01963980.6 | 14.08.2001 | [2003/30] | WO2001US25399 | Priority number, date | US20000225209P | 14.08.2000 Original published format: US 225209 P | US20010283921P | 16.04.2001 Original published format: US 283921 P | [2003/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0215571 | Date: | 21.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1329099 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1329099 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.02.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/445, G06F3/00, G06F13/00 | [2003/30] | CPC: |
H04N21/812 (EP,US);
H04N21/4314 (EP,US);
H04N21/435 (EP,US);
H04N21/47 (EP,US);
H04N21/4821 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGEN VON WERBUNG IN EINER INTERAKTIVEN PROGRAMMZEITSCHRIFT | [2008/23] | English: | DISPLAYING ADVERTISING IN AN INTERACTIVE PROGRAM GUIDE | [2008/23] | French: | AFFICHAGE DE BANDEAUX PUBLICITAIRES DANS UN GUIDE DE PROGRAMMES INTERACTIF | [2008/23] |
Former [2003/30] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM ANZEIGEN VON WERBUNG IN EINER INTERAKTIVEN PROGRAMMZEITSCHRIFT | ||
Former [2003/30] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DISPLAYING ADVERTISING IN AN INTERACTIVE PROGRAM GUIDE | ||
Former [2003/30] | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE D'AFFICHAGE DE BANDEAUX PUBLICITAIRES DANS UN GUIDE DE PROGRAMMES INTERACTIF | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2003 | Search fee paid | 14.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/30] | 02.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2008 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   15.09.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.10.2008 | BE | 29.10.2008 | CY | 29.10.2008 | DK | 29.10.2008 | FI | 29.10.2008 | IT | 29.10.2008 | NL | 29.10.2008 | TR | 29.10.2008 | SE | 29.01.2009 | GR | 30.01.2009 | ES | 09.02.2009 | PT | 30.03.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2010/47] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
IT | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
GR | 30.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
IT | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/38] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 09.02.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9749242 (STARSIGHT TELECAST INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 6-8 *; | [A]US5781246 (ALTEN JERRY [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 18,26 *; | [XA]WO9904561 (GUIDE E INC [US], et al) [X] 1-5,9-15,31-35 * page 28, line 16 - page 30, line 26; figure 7; sequence 4 * [A] 6-8; | [A]US6075575 (SCHEIN STEVEN M [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [PX]WO0079798 (UNITED VIDEO PROPERTIES INC [US]) [PX] 1-15,31-35 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US5559548 (DAVIS BRUCE [US], et al); | [A]US5594509 (FLORIN FABRICE [US], et al); | [A]US5940073 (KLOSTERMAN BRIAN LEE [US], et al); | [A]US6064376 (BEREZOWSKI DAVID MICHAEL [US], et al); | [XP]US6177931 (ALEXANDER RONALD [US], et al) |