EP1307896 - EXTERNALLY EXCITED TORROIDAL PLASMA SOURCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. P.O. Box 450A Santa Clara, California 95052 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/19] | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. P.O. Box 450A Santa Clara, California 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANAWA, Hiroji 696 Spruce Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | 02 /
YE, Yan 13271 Via Arriba Drive Saratoga, CA 95008 / US | 03 /
COLLINS, Kenneth, S. 7214 Glenview Drive San Jose, CA 95120 / US | 04 /
RAMASWAMY, Kartik 3282 St. Ignatius Place, 322 Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | 05 /
NGUYEN, Andrew 3148 Hostetter Road San Jose, CA 95132 / US | 06 /
TANAKA, Tsutomu 744 Nicholson Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | [2003/25] |
Former [2003/19] | 01 /
HANAWA, Hiroji 696 Spruce Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | ||
02 /
YE, Yan 13271 Via Arriba Drive Campbell, CA 95008 / US | |||
03 /
COLLINS, Kenneth, S. 7214 Glenview Drive San Jose, CA 95120 / US | |||
04 /
RAMASWAMY, Kartik 3282 St. Ignatius Place, 322 Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | |||
05 /
NGUYEN, Andrew 3148 Hostetter Road San Jose, CA 95132 / US | |||
06 /
TANAKA, Tsutomu 744 Nicholson Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Gerd Heinrich, et al Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/19] | Zimmermann, Gerd Heinrich, et al Zimmermann & Partner, P.O. Box 33 09 20 80069 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01964028.3 | 13.08.2001 | [2003/19] | WO2001US25505 | Priority number, date | US20000638075 | 11.08.2000 Original published format: US 638075 | US20000636435 | 11.08.2000 Original published format: US 636435 | US20000637174 | 11.08.2000 Original published format: US 637174 | US20000636436 | 11.08.2000 Original published format: US 636436 | US20000636434 | 11.08.2000 Original published format: US 636434 | US20000636699 | 11.08.2000 Original published format: US 636699 | US20000636700 | 11.08.2000 Original published format: US 636700 | [2003/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0215650 | Date: | 21.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1307896 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/32 | [2003/19] | CPC: |
H01J37/321 (EP,KR);
H01J37/32082 (EP);
H01J37/3244 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2004/20] |
Former [2003/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VON AUSSEN ANGEREGTE TORROIDFÖRMIGE PLASMAQUELLE | [2003/19] | English: | EXTERNALLY EXCITED TORROIDAL PLASMA SOURCE | [2003/19] | French: | SOURCE DE PLASMA TORRO DALE EXT RIEUREMENT EXCIT E | [2003/19] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/19] | 01.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/34] | 07.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4431898 (REINBERG ALAN R [US], et al) [Y] 1-4,12-15,17 * column 3, line 22 - column 4, line 45; figures 2,3 *; | [A]EP0546852 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [A] 1-3,12-15,17* column 5, line 55 - column 6, line 10; figure 3 *; | [Y]US5542559 (KAWAKAMI SATORU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-4,12-15,17 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9900823 (APPLIED SCIENCE & TECH INC [US]) [A] 1-3,12-15,17 * abstract * |