EP1334165 - DESULFURIZATION AND NOVEL SORBENTS FOR SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.06.2005 [2005/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ConocoPhillips Company 600 North Dairy Ashford Houston, TX 77079 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/33] | For all designated states Conoco Phillips Company 600 North Dairy Ashford Houston, TX 77079 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KHARE, Gyanesh, P. 19418 Texas Laurel Trail Kingwood, TX 77346-3309 / US | 02 /
ENGELBERT, Donald, R. P.O. Box 336 Copan, OK 74022 / US | [2003/33] | Representative(s) | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/14] | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/33] | Ricker, Mathias, Dr. Jones Day, Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte, Prinzregentenstrasse 56 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01964246.1 | 21.08.2001 | [2003/33] | WO2001US26062 | Priority number, date | US20000653131 | 31.08.2000 Original published format: US 653131 | [2003/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0218517 | Date: | 07.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1334165 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.03.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C10G25/02, C10G25/12, C10G29/00, C10G29/04, C10G29/16, B01J20/06, B01J20/08, B01J20/10, B01J20/12, B01J20/30, B01J20/34, C10G25/00 | [2004/45] | CPC: |
B01J20/2803 (EP);
B01J20/12 (KR);
B01J20/0225 (EP);
B01J20/0244 (EP);
B01J20/06 (EP);
B01J20/08 (EP);
B01J20/10 (EP);
B01J20/14 (EP);
B01J20/28004 (EP);
B01J20/28014 (EP);
B01J20/28019 (EP);
B01J20/28042 (EP);
B01J20/3078 (EP);
B01J20/3204 (EP);
B01J20/3236 (EP);
B01J20/3289 (EP);
B01J20/3433 (EP);
B01J20/3458 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2003/33] | C10G25/02, C10G25/12, C10G29/00, C10G29/04, C10G29/16, B01J20/06, B01J20/08, B01J20/10, B01J20/12, B01J20/30, B01J20/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENTSCHWEFELUNG UND NEUE SOPRTIONSMITTEL HIERFÜR | [2003/33] | English: | DESULFURIZATION AND NOVEL SORBENTS FOR SAME | [2003/33] | French: | DESULFURATION ET NOUVEAUX SORBANTS PERMETTANT CETTE DESULFURATION | [2003/33] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2003 | Search fee paid | 24.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/33] | 07.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/26] | 14.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4634515 (BAILEY GEORGE W [US], et al) [Y] 1-46 * column 3, line 20 - line 22 * * column 7, line 10 - line 10 * * example - *; | [Y]US5972835 (GUPTA RAGHUBIR P [US]) [Y] 1-46* example -; claim 1 * | International search | [Y]US5914292 (KHARE GYANESH P [US], et al); | [Y]US4419224 (MILLER J WAYNE [US], et al); | [X]US2951034 (STUART ARCHIBALD P); | [A]US6056871 (KHARE GYANESH P [US], et al) |