EP1397461 - REDUCED TOXICITY ETHYLENE GLYCOL-BASED ANTIFREEZE/HEAT TRANSFER FLUID CONCENTRATES AND ANTIFREEZE/HEAT TRANSFER FLUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.08.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EVANS COOLING SYSTEMS, INC. 253 Route 41 North Sharon, CT 06069 / US | [2004/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EVANS, John, W. 253 Route 41 North Sharon, CT 06069 / US | 02 /
LIGHT, J., Thomas 94 White Hollow Road Lakeville, CT 06039 / US | [2004/12] | Representative(s) | Gaucherand, Michel IXAS Conseil 15, rue Emile Zola 69002 Lyon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/12] | Gaucherand, Michel IXAS Conseil 15 Rue Emile Zola 69002 Lyon / FR | Application number, filing date | 01964342.8 | 23.08.2001 | [2004/12] | WO2001US26270 | Priority number, date | US20010274600P | 10.03.2001 Original published format: US 274600 P | US20010877306 | 08.06.2001 Original published format: US 877306 | [2004/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02072728 | Date: | 19.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1397461 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C09K5/00, C09K5/10, C09K3/18 | [2004/12] | CPC: |
C09K5/10 (EP,US);
C09K5/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TOXIZITÄTREDUZIERTE ETHYLENGLYKOLBASIERENDE GEFRIERSCHUTZ- BZW. WÄRMEAUSTAUSCHMITTELKONZENTRATE UND GEFRIERSCHUTZ- BZW. WÄRMEAUSTAUSCHMITTEL | [2004/12] | English: | REDUCED TOXICITY ETHYLENE GLYCOL-BASED ANTIFREEZE/HEAT TRANSFER FLUID CONCENTRATES AND ANTIFREEZE/HEAT TRANSFER FLUIDS | [2004/12] | French: | CONCENTRES DE FLUIDE ANTIGEL/CALOPORTEUR A BASE D'ETHYLENE GLYCOL A TOXICITE REDUITE ET FLUIDES ANTIGELS/CALOPORTEURS | [2004/12] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2003 | Search fee paid | 07.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/12] | 01.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/37] | 11.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 10.10.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.01.2004 | 31.08.2006 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   26.02.2007 | 31.08.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US9637570 ; | [X]JPS55125181 (WAKO PURE CHEM IND LTD, et al); | [X]US4455248 (WOOD DONALD L [US]); | [X]JPH0331388 (NIPPON OIL CO LTD); | [X]US5370814 (SALYER IVAL O [US]); | [X]US5817252 (HU JOSEPH ZHEN [US], et al); | [X]US5935488 (WIESENFELD ARNOLD [US], et al); | [A]US5993684 (BACK DWIGHT D [US], et al) |