EP1323052 - WORK SHARING AND COMMUNICATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.02.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Practicefirst.COM L.L.C. 132 Central Street, Suite 203B Foxboro, MA 02035 / US | [2003/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAXLER, Andrea 2 Robinswood Way Andover, MA 01810 / US | [2003/27] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/42] | Lord, Michael Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | ||
Former [2003/27] | Brunner, Michael John GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 01964446.7 | 27.08.2001 | [2003/27] | WO2001US26633 | Priority number, date | US20000648473 | 25.08.2000 Original published format: US 648473 | [2003/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0217104 | Date: | 28.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1323052 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1323052 | Date: | 01.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.02.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16, G06F15/173, G06F17/00, G06F12/00, G06Q10/06, G06Q10/10, G06Q50/22, H04L29/08 | [2014/51] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
G16H10/60 (EP,US);
H04L67/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/27] | G06F15/16, G06F15/173, G06F17/00, G06F12/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/20] |
Former [2003/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | ARBEITSVERTEILUNG UND KOMMUNIZIEREN | [2003/27] | English: | WORK SHARING AND COMMUNICATING | [2003/27] | French: | PARTAGE DU TRAVAIL ET COMMUNICATION | [2003/27] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2003 | Search fee paid | 24.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/38] | 15.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/10] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 06.01.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 06.01.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.01.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.10.2003 | 31.08.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   02.09.2004 | 31.08.2007 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   27.11.2007 | 31.08.2008 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   26.02.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 01.04.2015 | IT | 01.04.2015 | [2016/21] |
Former [2015/50] | ES | 01.04.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9963464 (I2 TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-13 * page 3, line 15 - line 29 * * page 8, line 9 - line L * * page 10, line 5 - line 10 * * page 23, line 20 - line L * * page 29, line 7 - line 19 * * page 35, line 18 - page 37, line 9 * * figure 8 *; | [X]WO0033156 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1-13 * page 1, line 5 - page 3, line 1 * * page 4, line 19 - line 25 * * page 5, line 11 - line 18 * * page 7, line 21 - page 8, line 12 * * page 14, line 15 - line 19 * * page 16, line 1 - line 4 *; | [X] - CHAIKEN B P ET AL, "ENHANCING QUALITY AND CONTROLLING COSTS: USING INTERNET TECHNOLOGY TO APPLY WORKFLOW TO HEALTH CARE", HEALTHCARE INFORMATION MANAGEMENT, MEDTECH PUBLISHING COMPANY, LLC, US, (19970101), vol. 11, no. 3, ISSN 1066-906X, pages 73 - 80, XP009084977 [X] 1-13 * the whole document * | [A] - FOX ET AL, "The Integrated Supply Chain Management System", SIEMENS. POWER QUALITY. KATALOG SR 10.1.1,, (19931207), pages 1 - 11, XP002090173 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5799318 (CARDINAL DAVID J [US], et al); | [Y]US5889952 (HUNNICUTT HEATH [US], et al); | [Y]US6038601 (LAMBERT MARK L [US], et al) |