EP1311431 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR INFLATING AND SEALING PILLOWS IN PACKAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.11.2007 [2007/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Free-Flow Packaging International, Inc. 1090 Mills Way Redwood City California 94063-3120 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/21] | For all designated states Free-Flow Packaging International, Inc. 1090 Mills Way Redwood City, California 94063-3120 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERKINS, Andrew Apartment 104, 2466 Hilgard Berkeley, CA 94709 / US | 02 /
REYES, Oliver, M. 1511-A Hearst Street Berkeley, CA 94703 / US | 03 /
BORCHARD, Philipp 140 Scott Street San Francisco, CA 94117 / US | 04 /
DE LUCA, Nicholas, P. 1230 Market Street 132 San Francisco, CA 94102 / US | [2003/21] | Representative(s) | Merrifield, Sarah Elizabeth, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/21] | Merrifield, Sarah Elizabeth, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 01964572.0 | 06.08.2001 | [2003/21] | WO2001US41589 | Priority number, date | US20000638843 | 14.08.2000 Original published format: US 638843 | [2003/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0214156 | Date: | 21.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1311431 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.02.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B65B31/00 | [2003/21] | CPC: |
B32B3/12 (EP,US);
B29C65/223 (EP,US);
B29C66/00441 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C66/133 (EP,US);
B29C66/232 (EP,US);
B29C66/344 (EP,US);
B29C66/439 (EP,US);
B29C66/8122 (EP,US);
B29C66/81465 (EP,US);
B29C66/83411 (EP,US);
B29C66/83413 (EP,US);
B29C66/8511 (EP,US);
B31D5/0073 (EP,US);
B65D81/052 (EP,US);
B29L2022/02 (EP,US);
B29L2031/7138 (EP,US);
B29L2031/714 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1712 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1737 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1334 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1345 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24562 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24612 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/8122, B29K2827/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/21] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFBLASEN UND VERSIEGELN VON KISSENFÖRMIGEN VERPACKUNGEN | [2003/21] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR INFLATING AND SEALING PILLOWS IN PACKAGING | [2003/21] | French: | PROCEDES ET APPAREIL DE GONFLAGE ET DE FERMETURE D'EMBALLAGES DE TYPE COUSSIN | [2003/21] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2003 | Search fee paid | 04.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.03.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/21] | 19.10.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4961302 (DAVIS STEVEN D [US]) [A] 1-35* column 3, line 65 - column 6, line 68; figure - *; | [A]US5937614 (WATKINS DAVID LEONARD [GB], et al) [A] 1-35 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US4017351 (LARSON CURTIS L, et al); | [Y]US4096306 (LARSON CURTIS L); | [Y]US4169002 (LARSON CURTIS L); | [Y]US5427830 (PHARO DANIEL A [US]); | [Y]US5581983 (MURAKAMI SADAJI [JP]); | [YP]WO0064672 (SIMHAEE EBRAHIM [US]) |