EP1318876 - METHOD AND INSTALLATION FOR PRODUCING METAL STRIPS AND SHEETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2005 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMS Demag Aktiengesellschaft Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [2003/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEIDEL, Jürgen Feuerdornweg 8 57223 Kreuztal / DE | 02 /
KNEPPE, Günter Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 11 57271 Hilchenbach / DE | 03 /
HAFER, Joachim Gosenbacher Strasse 3 57080 Siegen / DE | [2003/25] | Representative(s) | Valentin, Ekkehard Patentanwälte Hemmerich, Valentin, Gihske, Grosse Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/44] | Valentin, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Hemmerich, Valentin, Gihske, Grosse, Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | ||
Former [2003/25] | Valentin, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte, Müller-Grosse- Pollmeier-Valentin-Gihske, Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01965207.2 | 23.08.2001 | [2003/25] | WO2001EP09721 | Priority number, date | DE2000147044 | 22.09.2000 Original published format: DE 10047044 | [2003/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0224355 | Date: | 28.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1318876 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1318876 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B21B1/46 | [2003/25] | CPC: |
B21B1/466 (EP,US);
B21B1/46 (KR);
B21B1/26 (EP,US);
B21B27/00 (EP,US);
B21B27/10 (EP,US);
B21B28/04 (EP,US);
B21B45/004 (EP,US);
B21B45/0251 (EP,US);
B21B45/08 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANLAGE ZUM HERSTELLEN VON BÄNDERN UND BLECHEN AUS STAHL | [2003/25] | English: | METHOD AND INSTALLATION FOR PRODUCING METAL STRIPS AND SHEETS | [2003/25] | French: | PROCEDE ET INSTALLATION POUR PRODUIRE DES FEUILLARDS ET DES TOLES EN ACIER | [2003/25] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/25] | 29.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 27.10.2004 | FR | 27.10.2004 | IE | 27.10.2004 | NL | 27.10.2004 | TR | 27.10.2004 | DK | 27.01.2005 | GR | 27.01.2005 | SE | 27.01.2005 | PT | 27.03.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/10] | FI | 27.10.2004 | |
FR | 27.10.2004 | ||
IE | 27.10.2004 | ||
NL | 27.10.2004 | ||
TR | 27.10.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
SE | 27.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 27.10.2004 | |
FR | 27.10.2004 | ||
IE | 27.10.2004 | ||
NL | 27.10.2004 | ||
TR | 27.10.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/32] | FI | 27.10.2004 | |
FR | 27.10.2004 | ||
IE | 27.10.2004 | ||
NL | 27.10.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 27.10.2004 | |
IE | 27.10.2004 | ||
NL | 27.10.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 27.10.2004 | |
IE | 27.10.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 27.10.2004 | |
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 27.10.2004 | Cited in | International search | [XA]JPS57146403 ; | [XA]JPS57146404 ; | [XA]JPS57149007 ; | [XA]JPS57149008 ; | [DA]EP0808672 (SCHLOEMANN SIEMAG AG [DE]) [DA] 1,2,7,13,14,16,18* the whole document *; | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821208), vol. 006, no. 249, Database accession no. (M - 177), & JP57146403 A 19820909 (KAWASAKI SEITETSU KK) [X] 1,2,8-10,13 * abstract * [A] 3-7,11,14,16,18,21 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821208), vol. 006, no. 249, Database accession no. (M - 177), & JP57146404 A 19820909 (KAWASAKI SEITETSU KK) [X] 1,2,8-10,13 * abstract * [A] 3-7,11,14,16,18,21 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821211), vol. 006, no. 253, Database accession no. (M - 178), & JP57149007 A 19820914 (KAWASAKI SEITETSU KK) [X] 1,2,8,13 * abstract * [A] 3-7,9-11,14,16,18,21 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821211), vol. 006, no. 253, Database accession no. (M - 178), & JP57149008 A 19820914 (KAWASAKI SEITETSU KK) [X] 1,2,8,13 * abstract * [A] 3-7,9-11,14,16,18,21 | [A] - ROHDE W, "COMPACT STRIP PRODUCTION (CSP): THE APPROACH FOR ECONOMICAL PRODUCTION OF HOT WIDE STRIP", CAHIERS D'INFORMATIONS TECHNIQUES DE LA REVUE DE METALLURGIE, REVUE DE METALLURGIE. PARIS, FR, (19940401), vol. 91, no. 4, ISSN 0035-1563, pages 529 - 540, XP000449405 [A] 1,2,7,13,14,16-18,21 * page 532 - page 540; figures 9,11,12; tables I,II,IV * | [DA] - ROHDE W ET AL, "STAND, LEISTUNGSVERMÖGEN UND WEITERENTWICKLUNG DER CSP-TECHNOLOGIE", STAHL UND EISEN, VERLAG STAHLEISEN GMBH. DÜSSELDORF, DE, (19950915), vol. 115, no. 9, ISSN 0340-4803, pages 89 - 99,148, XP000527912 [DA] 1,2,7,13,14,16-18,21 * the whole document * |