EP1319248 - CONTROL OF SEPARATION BETWEEN GATE AND STORAGE NODE IN VERTICAL DRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] | 10.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies North America Corp. 1730 North First Street San Jose, CA 95112-4508 / US | [2003/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEITZ, Mihel 35 Mina Drive Wappinger Falls, NY 12590 / US | 02 /
KNORR, Andreas 2607 Trailsie Drive Austin TX 78704 / US | 03 /
MCSTAY, Irene 71 Saint Andrews Lane Hopewell, NY 12533 / US | [2003/36] |
Former [2003/25] | 01 /
SEITZ, Mihel 35 Mina Drive Wappinger Falls, NY 12590 / US | ||
02 /
KNORR, Andreas 4B Locust Court Fishkill, NY 12524 / US | |||
03 /
MCSTAY, Irene 71 Saint Andrews Lane Hopewell, NY 12533 / US | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schlossschmidstrasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/40] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/25] | Epping Hermann & Fischer Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01966082.8 | 22.08.2001 | [2003/25] | WO2001US26232 | Priority number, date | US20000664825 | 19.09.2000 Original published format: US 664825 | [2003/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0225729 | Date: | 28.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1319248 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1319248 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/8242, H01L21/20 | [2003/25] | CPC: |
H10B12/0385 (EP,US);
H10B12/00 (KR);
H10B12/0383 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2003/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | KONTROLLE DES ABSTANDS ZWISCHEN GATE UND SPEICHERKNOTEN IN VERTIKALEM DRAM | [2003/25] | English: | CONTROL OF SEPARATION BETWEEN GATE AND STORAGE NODE IN VERTICAL DRAM | [2003/25] | French: | CONTROLE DE SEPARATION ENTRE LA PORTE DE TRANSFERT ET LE NOEUD DE STOCKAGE DANS LE DRAM VERTICAL | [2003/25] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/25] | 08.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   19.02.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 05.10.2011 | [2012/37] | Cited in | International search | [A]US5451809 (SHIOZAWA JUN-ICHI [US], et al); | [A]EP0715350 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); | [A]EP0720220 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]US6063657 (BRONNER GARY B [US], et al); | [A]WO0035006 (IBM [US], et al) |