EP1323312 - REGENERATION OF PROGRAM CLOCK REFERENCE DATA FOR MPEG TRANSPORT STREAMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL INSTRUMENT CORPORATION 101 Tournament Drive Horsham Pennsylvania 19044 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/27] | For all designated states General Instrument Corporation 101 Tournament Drive Horsham, Pennsylvania 19044 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEMIROFF, Robert, S. 6718 Blue Point Drive Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | 02 /
LIU, Vincent 7714 Roan Road San Diego, CA 92129 / US | 03 /
WU, Siu-Wai 12655 Fairbrook Road San Diego, CA 92131 / US | [2003/27] | Representative(s) | Regelmann, Thomas HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/27] | Regelmann, Thomas, Dr. Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner, Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 01966481.2 | 31.08.2001 | [2003/27] | WO2001US27191 | Priority number, date | US20000667734 | 22.09.2000 Original published format: US 667734 | [2003/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0225952 | Date: | 28.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1323312 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1323312 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/24 | [2003/27] | CPC: |
H04N21/2365 (EP,US);
H04N21/2343 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/40 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/23608 (EP,US);
H04N21/242 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZEITBASISREFERENZDATUMREGENERATION FÜR MPEG-TRANSPORTSTRÖME | [2003/27] | English: | REGENERATION OF PROGRAM CLOCK REFERENCE DATA FOR MPEG TRANSPORT STREAMS | [2003/27] | French: | REGENERATION DE DONNEES DE REFERENCE D'HORLOGE DE PROGRAMME POUR DES FLUX DE TRANSPORT MPEG | [2003/27] | Entry into regional phase | 01.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 01.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/27] | 03.06.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.10.2004 | BE | 06.10.2004 | CH | 06.10.2004 | LI | 06.10.2004 | NL | 06.10.2004 | TR | 06.10.2004 | DK | 06.01.2005 | GR | 06.01.2005 | SE | 06.01.2005 | ES | 17.01.2005 | PT | 06.03.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/10] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
BE | 06.10.2004 | ||
CH | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
NL | 06.10.2004 | ||
TR | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
SE | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
BE | 06.10.2004 | ||
CH | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
NL | 06.10.2004 | ||
TR | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
BE | 06.10.2004 | ||
CH | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
NL | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
BE | 06.10.2004 | ||
CH | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
CH | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
CH | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | CH | 06.10.2004 | |
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | CH | 06.10.2004 | |
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 06.10.2004 | |
LI | 06.10.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0550843 (GEN INSTRUMENT CORP [US]); | [A]US5805220 (KEESMAN GERRIT J [NL], et al); | [A]US5905732 (FIMOFF MARK [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * column 8, line 46 - column 9, line 8 * * column 9, line 65 - column 10, line 17 *; | [X]US6002687 (MAGEE MARK [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * abstract * * column 5, line 1 - line 17 * * column 5, line 44 - column 6, line 42 * * column 7, line 27 - line 42 * * column 12, line 48 - line 67 * * column 15, line 14 - column 16, line 5 *; | [X]US6111896 (SLATTERY WILLIAM [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * abstract * * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 25 * * column 7, line 16 - column 8, line 7 * * column 20, line 65 - column 21, line 46 * * column 24, line 23 - column 25, line 61 * * column 28, line 48 - line 67 * |