EP1315502 - METHOD FOR TREATING ERECTILE DYSFUNCTION AND INCREASING LIBIDO IN MEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2011 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unimed Pharmaceuticals, LLC 901 Sawyer Road Marietta, GA 30062 / US | For all designated states LABORATOIRES BESINS INTERNATIONAL 3, rue du Bourg l'Abbé 75003 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | For all designated states Unimed Pharmaceuticals, LLC 901 Sawyer Road Marietta GA 30062 / US | ||
For all designated states LABORATOIRES BESINS INTERNATIONAL 3, rue du Bourg l'Abbé 75003 Paris / FR | |||
Former [2008/36] | For all designated states UNIMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 901 Sawyer Road Marietta, Georgia 30062 / US | ||
For all designated states LABORATOIRES BESINS INTERNATIONAL 3, rue du Bourg l'Abbé 75003 Paris / FR | |||
Former [2008/27] | For all designated states UNIMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 901 Sawyer Road Marietta, Georgia 30062 / US | ||
For all designated states LABORATOIRES BESINS INTERNATIONAL 5, rue du Bourg l'Abbé 75003 Paris / FR | |||
Former [2003/23] | For all designated states Unimed Pharmaceuticals Inc. Four Parkway North Deerfield, IL 60015 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUDLEY, Robert, E. 636 Wayland Avenue Kenilworth, IL 60043 / US | [2003/23] | Representative(s) | Nargolwalla, Cyra, et al Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | Nargolwalla, Cyra, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 65/67 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2003/23] | Gosmann, Martin, Dr., et al Solvay Pharmaceuticals GmbH, Patentabteilung, Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 30173 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 01966486.1 | 29.08.2001 | [2003/23] | WO2001US27205 | Priority number, date | US20000651777 | 30.08.2000 Original published format: US 651777 | US20000703753 | 01.11.2000 Original published format: US 703753 | [2003/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0217927 | Date: | 07.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1315502 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1315502 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/565, A61K31/519, A61K47/10, A61K47/14, A61P5/26 | [2009/38] | CPC: |
A61K31/568 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/565 (EP,US);
A61K31/5685 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K47/10 (EP,US);
A61K47/12 (EP,US);
A61K47/14 (EP,US);
A61K47/32 (EP,US);
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61P15/02 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P15/10 (EP);
A61P15/12 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P21/06 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/12 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P3/14 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P5/24 (EP);
A61P5/26 (EP);
A61P5/48 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/565, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/565, A61K31/415 (EP,US);
A61K31/565, A61K31/475 (US,EP);
A61K31/565, A61K31/485 (US,EP);
A61K31/565, A61K31/52 (US,EP);
A61K31/565, A61K31/557 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2003/23] | A61K31/565, A61K47/10, A61K47/14, A61P5/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/23] | Extension states | AL | 31.03.2003 | LT | 31.03.2003 | LV | 31.03.2003 | MK | 31.03.2003 | RO | 31.03.2003 | SI | 31.03.2003 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON EREKTIONSSTÖRUNGEN UND STEIGERUNG DER LIBIDO BEI MÄNNERN | [2003/23] | English: | METHOD FOR TREATING ERECTILE DYSFUNCTION AND INCREASING LIBIDO IN MEN | [2003/23] | French: | METHODE POUR TRAITER LA DYSERECTION ET AUGMENTER LA LIBIDO CHEZ L'HOMME | [2003/23] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 31.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/23] | 02.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 06.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/08] | Request for further processing for: | 07.01.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 07.01.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.01.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO9325168 (THERATECH INC [US]) [X] 1-31 * claims 1-9,17,21,24 * * page 19; example 3; table 2 * [Y] 32-56; | [Y]WO9966870 (LAVIPHARM LAB INC [US]) [Y] 32-56 * claims 1-8,21-23 ** page 9, line 18 - line 29 *; | [Y]WO0045795 (CIPLA LIMITED [IN], et al) [Y] 32-56 * claims 1-3,5,10,15,18 * |