EP1317853 - COMBINED STANDARD VIDEO AND HIGH-SPEED CAMERA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/03] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/47] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27 c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/24] | For all designated states FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 80636 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLOSS, Hans Tulpenweg 13 B 90562 Heroldsberg / DE | 02 /
GICK, Stephan Burgberg 2 96215 Lichtenfels / DE | [2003/24] | Representative(s) | Gagel, Roland Patentanwalt Dr. Roland Gagel Landsberger Strasse 480a 81241 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/22] | Gagel, Roland Patentanwalt Dr. Roland Gagel Landsberger Strasse 480a 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01966999.3 | 09.08.2001 | [2003/24] | WO2001DE03085 | Priority number, date | DE20001043961 | 06.09.2000 Original published format: DE 10043961 | [2003/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0221828 | Date: | 14.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1317853 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1317853 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/335 | [2003/24] | CPC: |
H04N7/01 (EP);
H04N23/95 (EP);
H04N25/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2004/21] |
Former [2003/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMBINIERTE STANDARD-VIDEO- UND HIGH-SPEED-KAMERA | [2003/24] | English: | COMBINED STANDARD VIDEO AND HIGH-SPEED CAMERA | [2003/24] | French: | CAMERA VIDEO STANDARD ET A GRANDE VITESSE COMBINEE | [2003/24] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/24] | 24.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]JPH1132241 ; | [Y]US5303051 (LEVESQUE MARTIN [CA], et al) |