EP1303684 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A GAS AND STEAM TURBINE INSTALLATION AND CORRESPONDING INSTALLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2006 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.05.2006 [2006/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/17] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHWARZOTT, Werner Neue Str. 21 91091 Grossenseebach / DE | 02 /
SCHMID, Erich Am Ziegelacker 18 91080 Marloffstein / DE | [2003/17] | Application number, filing date | 01967162.7 | 12.07.2001 | [2003/17] | WO2001EP08079 | Priority number, date | EP20000115909 | 25.07.2000 Original published format: EP 00115909 | [2003/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0208577 | Date: | 31.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1303684 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1303684 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F01K23/10 | [2003/17] | CPC: |
F01K23/106 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT, PT [2004/22] |
Former [2003/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER GAS- UND DAMPFTURBINENANLAGE SOWIE ENTSPRECHENDE ANLAGE | [2003/17] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING A GAS AND STEAM TURBINE INSTALLATION AND CORRESPONDING INSTALLATION | [2003/17] | French: | PROCEDE SERVANT A FAIRE FONCTIONNER UNE INSTALLATION DE TURBINE A GAZ OU A VAPEUR, ET INSTALLATION CORRESPONDANTE | [2003/17] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/17] | 12.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | PT | 19.10.2005 | [2006/14] | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0281151 (BABCOCK HITACHI KK [JP]) [A] 1,6 * column 9, line 31 - column 10, line 55; figures 3,4 *; | [A]EP0309792 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1,6* column 4, line 33 - line 47; figure - *; | [A]DE19512466 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,6 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0523467 | DE19736889 |