EP1257748 - DISC BRAKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/35] | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE SYSTEME FÜR NUTZFAHRZEUGE GMBH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/47] | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUMGARTNER, Johann Thonstetten 23 85368 Moosburg / DE | 02 /
BIEKER, Dieter Sonneckstrasse 19 83080 Oberaudorf / DE | 03 /
PAHLE, Wolfgang Platanenstrasse 35 74080 Heilbronn / DE | [2002/47] | Representative(s) | Mattusch, Gundula Knorr-Bremse AG Patentabteilung V/RG Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/47] | Mattusch, Gundula Knorr-Bremse AG, Patentabteilung, Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01967265.8 | 14.08.2001 | [2002/47] | WO2001EP09365 | Priority number, date | DE2000140175 | 17.08.2000 Original published format: DE 10040175 | DE2001120328 | 26.04.2001 Original published format: DE 10120328 | [2002/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0214707 | Date: | 21.02.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1257748 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1257748 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/56, F16D65/18, F16D55/228 | [2002/47] | CPC: |
F16D55/227 (EP,US);
F16D55/22 (EP,US);
F16D55/2255 (EP,US);
F16D55/226 (EP,US);
F16D55/228 (EP,US);
F16D55/30 (EP,US);
F16D65/0037 (EP,US);
F16D65/18 (EP,US);
F16D65/183 (EP,US);
F16D65/567 (EP,US);
F16D65/568 (EP,US);
B60T2201/124 (EP,US);
F16D2055/002 (EP,US);
F16D2055/0062 (EP,US);
F16D2065/386 (EP,US);
F16D2121/02 (EP,US);
F16D2121/14 (EP,US);
F16D2125/26 (EP,US);
F16D2125/28 (EP,US);
F16D2125/32 (EP,US);
F16D2125/48 (EP,US);
F16D2125/52 (EP,US);
F16D2125/56 (EP,US);
F16D2125/64 (EP,US);
F16D2125/70 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FESTSATTEL-SCHEIBENBREMSE | [2002/47] | English: | DISC BRAKE | [2002/47] | French: | FREIN A DISQUE | [2002/47] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/12] | 22.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 30.08.2006 | FI | 30.08.2006 | FR | 30.08.2006 | IE | 30.08.2006 | IT | 30.08.2006 | NL | 30.08.2006 | TR | 30.08.2006 | DK | 30.11.2006 | GR | 01.12.2006 | ES | 11.12.2006 | PT | 12.02.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | CY | 30.08.2006 | |
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
FR | 30.08.2006 | ||
IE | 30.08.2006 | ||
IT | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
GR | 01.12.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/52] | FI | 30.08.2006 | |
FR | 30.08.2006 | ||
IE | 30.08.2006 | ||
IT | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
GR | 01.12.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | FI | 30.08.2006 | |
IE | 30.08.2006 | ||
IT | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
GR | 01.12.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.02.2007 | ||
FR | 11.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | FI | 30.08.2006 | |
IE | 30.08.2006 | ||
IT | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
GR | 01.12.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | FI | 30.08.2006 | |
IE | 30.08.2006 | ||
IT | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | FI | 30.08.2006 | |
IE | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 30.08.2006 | |
IE | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | FI | 30.08.2006 | |
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 30.08.2006 | |
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | FI | 30.08.2006 | |
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | FI | 30.08.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3059731 (PIERRE GANCEL, et al) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 22; figures 1,2,5 *; | [Y]FR1547063 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED) [Y] 1-6,9,10 * page 2, line 35 - page 3, line 24; figure 2 *; | [A]DE3332548 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [A] 1-10* page 9 - page 11; figure 1 *; | [Y]US5590744 (BELMOND JEAN-MARC [FR]) [Y] 1-6,9,10 * abstract * |