EP1315739 - METHOD FOR BINDING, IN SOLUTION, A PEPTIDE AND A LIPOPHILIC VECTOR AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUT PASTEUR DE LILLE Etablissement Public 1, rue du Professeur Calmette 59019 Lille Cédex / FR | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE -CNRS- 3, rue Michel-Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/23] | For all designated states INSTITUT PASTEUR DE LILLE Etablissement Public 1, rue du Professeur Calmette 59019 Lille Cédex / FR | ||
For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS) 3, rue Michel Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONNET, Dominique 73, avenue Marx Dormoy F-59000 Lille / FR | 02 /
BOUREL, Line 73, avenue Marx Dormoy F-59000 Lille / FR | 03 /
MELNYK, Oleg 13, impasse Delecourt F-59112 Annoeullin / FR | 04 /
GRAS-MASSE, Hélène 321 La Rosière F-59710 Merignies / FR | [2003/24] |
Former [2003/23] | 01 /
BONNET, Dominique 73, avenue Marx Dormoy F-59000 Lille / FR | ||
02 /
BOUREL, Line 73, avenue Marx Dormoy F-59000 Lille / FR | |||
03 /
MELNYK, Oleg 13, impasse Delecourt F-59112 Annoeullin / FR | Representative(s) | Lepeudry-Gautherat, Thérèse, et al Lepeudry et Associés 43 Rue de la Brèche aux Loups 75012 Paris / FR | [2009/30] |
Former [2003/23] | Lepeudry-Gautherat, Thérèse, et al CABINET LEPEUDRY, 43, rue de la Brèche aux Loups 75012 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 01967454.8 | 07.09.2001 | [2003/23] | WO2001FR02787 | Priority number, date | FR20000011451 | 08.09.2000 Original published format: FR 0011451 | [2003/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0220558 | Date: | 14.03.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1315739 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1315739 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07K1/107, A61K47/48, C07C233/03, C07D209/32, A61K39/395 | [2003/23] | CPC: |
C07D263/04 (EP,US);
A61K47/54 (EP,US);
C07C235/74 (EP,US);
C07K1/1077 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KUPPLUNG IN LÖSUNG ZWISCHEN EINEM PEPTID UND EINER LIPOPHILEN VERBINDUNG, UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2003/23] | English: | METHOD FOR BINDING, IN SOLUTION, A PEPTIDE AND A LIPOPHILIC VECTOR AND USES THEREOF | [2003/23] | French: | PROCEDE DE COUPLAGE, EN SOLUTION, ENTRE UN PEPTIDE ET UN VECTEUR LIPOPHILE ET SES APPLICATIONS | [2003/23] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/23] | 14.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.03.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.08.2004 | CY | 18.08.2004 | FI | 18.08.2004 | NL | 18.08.2004 | TR | 18.08.2004 | MC | 30.09.2004 | DK | 18.11.2004 | GR | 18.11.2004 | SE | 18.11.2004 | ES | 29.11.2004 | PT | 18.01.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/10] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
CY | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
NL | 18.08.2004 | ||
TR | 18.08.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
ES | 29.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
NL | 18.08.2004 | ||
TR | 18.08.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
ES | 29.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
NL | 18.08.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
ES | 29.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
ES | 29.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 18.08.2004 | |
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 18.11.2004 | Cited in | International search | [X] - FRUCHART, JEAN-SEBASTIEN ET AL, "A new tartaric acid-based linker for the synthesis of C-terminal peptide.alpha.-oxo-aldehydes", CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 134:237782 CA, URL: STN, XP002172766 [X] 15-23 | [ ] - PEPT. NEW MILLENNIUM, PROC. AM. PEPT. SYMP., 16TH (2000), MEETING DATE 1999, 104-106. EDITOR(S): FIELDS, GREGG B.;TAM, JAMES P.; BARANY, GEORGE. PUBLISHER: KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DORDRECHT, NETH., (2000) [ ] * abstract * | [A] - C GRANDJEAN ET AL., "Convergent synthesis of D-(-)-quinic and shikimic acid-containing dendrimers as potential C-lectin ligands by sulfide ligation of unprotected fragments", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, PERKIN TRANSACTIONS 1., CHEMICAL SOCIETY. LETCHWORTH., GB, (199910), no. 10, ISSN 1472-7781, pages 2967 - 2975, XP002137985 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/a904679h | [AD] - O MELNYK ET AL., "Synthesis of lipopeptides using hydrazone chemical ligation", JOURNAL OF PEPTIDE RESEARCH., MUNKSGAARD, COPENHAGEN., DK, (199809), vol. 52, no. 9, ISSN 0367-8377, pages 180 - 184, XP000774264 [AD] 1-14 * the whole document * | [AD] - J SHAO & J P TAM, "Unprotected peptides as building blocks for the synthesis of peptide dendrimers with oxime, hydrazone, and thiazolidine linkage", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY., AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC., US, (19950412), vol. 117, no. 14, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 3893 - 3899, XP002172763 [AD] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00119a001 | [PX] - D BONNET ET AL., "A novel lipophilic glyoxylic acid derivative for the lipidation of peptides using salt-free hydrazone ligation", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS., ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM., NL, (200012), vol. 41, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 10003 - 10007, XP002172764 [PX] 1-27 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)01784-6 | [PX] - D BONNET ET AL., "Synthesis of an amphiphilic aldehyde using as a key step the condensation of a lipophilic glyoxylic acid derivative with tris(hydroxymehtyl)aminomethane", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS., ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM., NL, (20010304), vol. 42, no. 10, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 1875 - 1877, XP002172765 [PX] 1-27 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(01)00032-6 |