EP1435842 - DEVICE FOR LOCATING A PUNCTURE HOLE IN A LIQUID-CARRYING VESSEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.2011 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abbott Vascular Inc. 400 Saginaw Drive Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | [2010/42] |
Former [2007/29] | For all designated states Abbott Vascular Inc 400 Saginaw Drive Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | ||
Former [2006/03] | For all designated states Nova Science Limited 3010 Lake Drive Citywest Dublin 24 / IE | ||
Former [2004/29] | For all designated states Coleman, James E. 20 Greenmount Road, Terenure Dublin 6 / IE | ||
For all designated states Cummins, Christy 54 Knockowen, Tullamore County Offaly / IE | |||
For all designated states Martin, Chris 2 Blackburn Square, Rathfarnham Dublin 14 / IE | |||
For all designated states Anthony, Thomas 49 Grange Downs, Rathfarnham Dublin 14 / IE | |||
For all designated states Morris, Sean Newpark, Kiltoom, Athlone County Roscommon / IE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Coleman, James E. 20 Greenmount Road, Terenure Dublin 6 / IE | 02 /
Cummins, Christy 9 Furnes Manor Johnstown, Naas, County Kildare / IE | 03 /
Martin, Christopher 33 Greentrees Road Dublin 12 / IE | 04 /
Anthony, Thomas Main Street Altown, County Kilkenny / IE | 05 /
Morris, Sean Newpark, Kiltoom Athlone, County Roscommon / IE | [2006/03] |
Former [2004/29] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/39] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2004/29] | Brophy, David, et al F.R. Kelly & Co. 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 01967638.6 | 07.09.2001 | [2004/29] | WO2001IE00115 | Priority number, date | IE20000000722 | 08.09.2000 Original published format: IE 20000722 | IE20000000724 | 08.09.2000 Original published format: IE 20000724 | [2010/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0219915 | Date: | 14.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1435842 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1435842 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/42] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1435842 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | [2011/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00, A61B17/068, A61B17/064 | [2004/29] | CPC: |
A61B17/0684 (EP,US);
A61B17/0057 (EP,US);
A61B17/0644 (EP,US);
A61B17/068 (EP,US);
A61B17/0682 (EP,US);
A61B17/1285 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ORTEN EINES PUNKTIERTEN BLUTGEFÄSSES | [2004/29] | English: | DEVICE FOR LOCATING A PUNCTURE HOLE IN A LIQUID-CARRYING VESSEL | [2004/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE LOCALISER UN ORIFICE DANS UN VAISSEAU TRANSPORTANT UN LIQUIDE | [2004/29] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 15.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.10.2010 | BE | 20.10.2010 | CY | 20.10.2010 | DK | 20.10.2010 | FI | 20.10.2010 | IT | 20.10.2010 | SE | 20.10.2010 | TR | 20.10.2010 | GR | 21.01.2011 | ES | 31.01.2011 | PT | 21.02.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/26] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
CY | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
IT | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
IT | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | FI | 20.10.2010 | |
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5292309 (VAN TASSEL ROBERT A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,10 * the whole document * [Y] 13; | [XA]US5431639 (SHAW WILLIAM J [US]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [A] 13; | [XA]US5643318 (TSUKERNIK VLADIMIR B [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [A] 13; | [YA]WO9817179 (GLEESON MALACHY [GB], et al) [Y] 13 * abstract * [A] 1-12; | [A]US5861005 (KONTOS STAVROS B [US]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0941697 (TRICARDIA LLC [US]) [A] 1-13* abstract * | by applicant | US5292309 |