EP1391414 - DOOR INSTALLED AT PLATFORM FOR ELEVATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 23.03.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2018 | Revocation of patent | published on 25.04.2018 [2018/17] | 23.03.2018 | New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2006/18] |
Former [2004/09] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORI, Akinobu 2-3, Marunoucchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
HARAGA, Kosuke 2-3, Marunoucchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
SUZUKI, Toshiya 2-3, Marunoucchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 04 /
HARUNA, Kazushi 2-3, Marunoucchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2004/09] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/09] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01967759.0 | 20.09.2001 | [2004/09] | WO2001JP08201 | Priority number, date | JP20010156826 | 25.05.2001 Original published format: JP 2001156826 | [2004/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02096793 | Date: | 05.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1391414 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1391414 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.12.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B66B13/30, E06B5/16 | [2005/20] | CPC: |
B66B13/303 (EP);
C08G18/8175 (EP);
E06B3/827 (EP);
E06B5/16 (EP);
E06B2003/7098 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/09] | B66B13/30 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2010/13] |
Former [2004/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | AUF EINER AUFZUGSPLATTFORM EINGESETZTE TÜR | [2004/09] | English: | DOOR INSTALLED AT PLATFORM FOR ELEVATOR | [2004/09] | French: | PORTE INSTALLEE SUR UNE PLATE-FORME D'ASCENSEUR | [2004/09] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2003 | Translation filed | 21.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2003 | Search fee paid | 21.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2003 | Examination requested [2004/09] | 30.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.12.2010
ADMISSIBLE Otis Elevator Company 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington CT 06032 / US Opponent's representative Leckey, David Herbert, et al, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.12.2010
ADMISSIBLE Otis Elevator Company 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington CT 06032 / US Opponent's representative Leckey, David Herbert, et al, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | 04.02.2011 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.08.2011 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 03.12.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.01.2014 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.01.2014 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 30.01.2018 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2018/17] | 01.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 01.04.2014 | Appeal received No. T0649/14 | 02.06.2014 | Statement of grounds filed | 30.01.2018 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 19.03.2014 | Appeal received No. T0649/14 | 06.05.2014 | Statement of grounds filed | 30.01.2018 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 30.01.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.02.2018 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP1258518 (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK [JP]) [E] 1-7 * page 12, line 1 - line 37 * | International search | [X]JP2001097657 (INVENTIO AG); | [Y]JPH10501009 |